|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 59 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7059 | ||
08/1932 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8625 | ||
1948 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR) | ||
02/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68625 | ||
22/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
23/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) | ||
19/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
21/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) | ||
19/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) | ||
01/01/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68625 | ||
02/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |