Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2078 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19881 Week
» 72897 Month
» 192424 Year
» 3219277 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
335 |
m/e |
04/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7335 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8497 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68497 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R24 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/09/1960 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
41F |
|
4w/e |
28/03/1958 |
ALLOC |
41B |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
4w/e |
19/03/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/09/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1935 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1957 |
Bury St. Edmunds |
No transfers are now being recorded between Cambridge (31A) and Bury (31E). Its sub-depot, Sudbury, is supplied by 31A. The present allocation of Bury is 61546/53/4/67/73/6, 62543, 65391, 68497, 69616/20. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 335 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7335 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8497 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE) |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68497 |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
19/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68497 |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|