Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
195 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7195 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8602 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68602 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S48 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 28/10/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1930 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1930 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1930 |
Condensers removed |
03/1930 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 195 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7195 |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8602 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68602 |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
28/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68602 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|