Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 2255 Today
» 4203 Yesterday
» 23674 Week
» 46645 Month
» 393069 Year
» 3419922 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
359 |
m/e |
04/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7359 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8536 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68536 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R29 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 21/02/1958 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1892 |
CAM |
|
Cambridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
MEL |
|
|
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
MEL |
|
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/02/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MEL |
|
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
MEL |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/02/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1929 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
12/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1929 |
Condensers removed |
12/1929 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 359 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7359 |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8536 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
20/03/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68536 |
|
|
20/08/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
21/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68536 |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|