Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1684 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15090 Week
» 68106 Month
» 187633 Year
» 3214486 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
378 |
m/e |
10/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7378 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8554 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68554 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 10/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 25/07/1961 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1929 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1929 |
Condensers removed |
03/1929 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
10/1936 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 378 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7378 |
|
|
03/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
03/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
10/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8554 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68554 |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
07/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
25/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68554 |
|
|