Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2460 Today
» 4203 Yesterday
» 23879 Week
» 46850 Month
» 393274 Year
» 3420127 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
410 |
m/e |
01/1891 |
Great Eastern Railway (2nd) |
14 |
m/e |
01/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7014 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8519 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68519 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B26 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 06/08/1958 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 410 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1920 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 14 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7014 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8519 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68519 |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
06/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68519 |
|
|
09/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|