J69 |
328
|
|
7328
|
8491
|
68491
|
|
03/1890 |
03/06/1958 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1935 |
J69 |
335
|
|
7335
|
8497
|
68497
|
|
04/1890 |
19/09/1960 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1935 |
J69 |
337
|
|
7337
|
8499
|
68499
|
|
04/1890 |
16/09/1962 |
Condensers removed |
12/1927 |
J69 |
338
|
|
7338
|
8500
|
68500
|
|
05/1890 |
13/01/1961 |
Condensers removed |
10/1928 |
J69 |
339
|
|
7339
|
8501
|
68501
|
|
05/1890 |
16/08/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
10/1926 |
J69 |
340
|
|
7340
|
8502
|
68502
|
|
05/1890 |
06/02/1961 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
10/1929 |
J69 |
341
|
|
7341
|
8503
|
68503
|
|
05/1890 |
03/01/1957 |
Condensers removed |
11/1928 |
J69 |
342
|
|
7342
|
8504
|
68504
|
|
05/1890 |
23/01/1956 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1927 |
J69 |
343
|
|
7343
|
8505
|
68505
|
|
05/1890 |
11/11/1953 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
04/1928 |
J69 |
344
|
|
7344
|
(8506)
|
|
|
05/1890 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1935 |
J69 |
345
|
|
7345
|
8507
|
68507
|
|
05/1890 |
06/06/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
02/1930 |
J69 |
346
|
|
7346
|
8508
|
68508
|
|
05/1890 |
02/02/1961 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
02/1930 |
J69 |
347
|
|
7347
|
8524
|
68524
|
|
02/1892 |
16/06/1959 |
Condensers removed |
08/1928 |
J69 |
348
|
|
7348
|
8525
|
(68525)
|
|
02/1892 |
14/12/1953 |
Condensers removed |
12/1927 |
J69 |
349
|
|
7349
|
8526
|
68526
|
|
03/1892 |
03/10/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1929 |
J69 |
350
|
|
7350
|
8527
|
68527
|
|
03/1892 |
20/06/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1929 |
J69 |
351
|
|
7351
|
8528
|
68528
|
|
03/1892 |
28/10/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1928 |
J69 |
352
|
|
7352
|
8529
|
68529
|
|
03/1892 |
18/08/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
07/1929 |
J69 |
353
|
|
7353
|
8530
|
68530
|
|
03/1892 |
14/02/1961 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1935 |
J69 |
354
|
|
7354
|
8531
|
68531
|
|
03/1892 |
08/10/1955 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1929 |
J69 |
355
|
|
7355
|
8532
|
68532
|
43
|
03/1892 |
16/12/1958 |
Condensers removed |
1930 |
J69 |
356
|
|
7356
|
8533
|
68533
|
|
03/1892 |
14/07/1953 |
Condensers removed |
02/1928 |
J69 |
357
|
|
7357
|
8534
|
68534
|
|
04/1892 |
30/08/1954 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
04/1928 |
J69 |
358
|
|
7358
|
8535
|
68535
|
|
04/1892 |
20/08/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1928 |
J69 |
359
|
|
7359
|
8536
|
68536
|
|
04/1892 |
21/02/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1929 |
J69 |
360
|
|
7360
|
8537
|
68537
|
|
04/1892 |
20/06/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
01/1929 |
J69 |
361
|
|
7361
|
8538
|
68538
|
|
04/1892 |
10/09/1961 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
07/1924 |
J69 |
362
|
|
7362
|
(8539)
|
|
|
04/1892 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
10/1939 |
J69 |
363
|
|
7363
|
8540
|
68540
|
|
05/1892 |
16/01/1956 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1929 |
J69 |
365
|
|
7365
|
8541
|
68541
|
|
05/1892 |
12/08/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1926 |
J69 |
366
|
|
7366
|
8542
|
68542
|
|
05/1892 |
16/09/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1928 |
J69 |
367
|
|
7367
|
8543
|
68543
|
45
|
04/1894 |
02/11/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1929 |
J69 |
368
|
|
7368
|
8544
|
68544
|
|
04/1894 |
31/01/1955 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1928 |
J69 |
369
|
|
7369
|
8545
|
68545
|
|
04/1894 |
03/02/1961 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
06/1937 |
J69 |
370
|
|
7370
|
8546
|
68546
|
|
05/1894 |
05/05/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
10/1928 |
J69 |
371
|
|
7371
|
8547
|
68547
|
|
05/1894 |
21/04/1956 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1926 |
J69 |
372
|
|
7372
|
8548
|
68548
|
|
05/1894 |
09/11/1953 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1924 |
J69 |
373
|
|
7373
|
8549
|
68549
|
|
05/1894 |
11/02/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1924 |
J69 |
374
|
|
7374
|
8550
|
68550
|
|
06/1894 |
25/07/1961 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
07/1928 |
J69 |
375
|
|
7375
|
8551
|
68551
|
|
06/1894 |
21/06/1957 |
Condensers removed |
01/1928 |
J69 |
376
|
|
7376
|
8552
|
68552
|
|
06/1894 |
10/09/1961 |
Condensers removed |
1939 |
J69 |
377
|
|
7377
|
8553
|
68553
|
|
10/1895 |
20/12/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1926 |
J69 |
378
|
|
7378
|
8554
|
68554
|
|
10/1895 |
25/07/1961 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1936 |
J69 |
379
|
|
7379
|
8555
|
68555
|
|
10/1895 |
05/05/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1928 |
J69 |
380
|
|
7380
|
8556
|
68556
|
|
10/1895 |
16/09/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
01/1930 |
J69 |
381
|
|
7381
|
8557
|
68557
|
|
10/1895 |
20/10/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
02/1930 |
J69 |
382
|
|
7382
|
8558
|
68558
|
|
11/1895 |
13/01/1961 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1926 |
J69 |
383
|
|
7383
|
8559
|
68559
|
|
11/1895 |
04/1956 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
01/1930 |
J69 |
384
|
|
7384
|
8560
|
68560
|
|
11/1895 |
10/01/1961 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1929 |
J69 |
385
|
|
7385
|
8561
|
68561
|
|
11/1895 |
14/07/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
07/1926 |
J69 |
386
|
|
7386
|
8562
|
68562
|
|
12/1895 |
15/08/1956 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1927 |
J69 |
387
|
|
7387
|
8563
|
68563
|
|
12/1895 |
03/10/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
01/1930 |
J69 |
388
|
|
7388
|
(8564)
|
|
|
12/1895 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
10/1939 |
J69 |
389
|
|
7389
|
8565
|
68565
|
|
12/1895 |
06/08/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1930 |
J69 |
390
|
|
7390
|
8566
|
68566
|
|
12/1895 |
05/09/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
06/1937 |
J69 |
391
|
|
7391
|
8567
|
68567
|
|
01/1896 |
18/08/1957 |
Condensers removed |
1932 |
J69 |
392
|
|
7392
|
8568
|
68568
|
|
01/1896 |
08/05/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1927 |
J69 |
393
|
|
7393
|
8569
|
68569
|
|
01/1896 |
02/06/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1929 |
J69 |
394
|
|
7394
|
8570
|
68570
|
|
01/1896 |
10/09/1961 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
10/1926 |
J69 |
395
|
|
7395
|
8571
|
68571
|
|
02/1896 |
04/12/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
02/1930 |
J69 |
396
|
|
7396
|
8572
|
68572
|
|
02/1896 |
29/11/1954 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1926 |
J69 |
265
|
|
7265
|
8573
|
68573
|
|
04/1896 |
01/08/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1929 |
J69 |
266
|
|
7266
|
8574
|
68574
|
|
04/1896 |
19/01/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1924 |
J69 |
267
|
|
7267
|
8575
|
68575
|
|
04/1896 |
06/10/1960 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1924 |
J69 |
268
|
|
7268
|
8576
|
68576
|
|
04/1896 |
12/03/1958 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1929 |
J69 |
269
|
|
7269
|
8577
|
68577
|
|
05/1896 |
10/11/1960 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1929 |
J69 |
270
|
|
7270
|
8578
|
68578
|
|
05/1896 |
16/01/1961 |
Condenser fitted |
1947 |
J69 |
271
|
|
7271
|
8579
|
68579
|
|
05/1896 |
18/01/1960 |
Condensers removed |
05/1944 |
J69 |
272
|
|
7272
|
(8580)
|
|
|
06/1896 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
04/1940 |
J69 |
273
|
|
7273
|
8581
|
68581
|
|
06/1896 |
28/09/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1929 |
J69 |
274
|
|
7274
|
(8582)
|
|
|
06/1896 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
05/1940 |
J69 |
189
|
305
|
7305
|
8596
|
68596
|
|
06/1900 |
06/11/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
01/1930 |
J69 |
190
|
|
7190
|
8597
|
68597
|
|
07/1900 |
11/10/1955 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1935 |
J69 |
191
|
|
7191
|
8598
|
68598
|
|
07/1900 |
11/05/1957 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1927 |
J69 |
192
|
|
7192
|
8599
|
68599
|
|
07/1900 |
02/11/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1929 |
J69 |
193
|
|
7193
|
8600
|
68600
|
|
07/1900 |
16/09/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1942 |
J69 |
194
|
|
7194
|
8601
|
68601
|
|
07/1900 |
01/10/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1926 |
J69 |
195
|
|
7195
|
8602
|
68602
|
|
07/1900 |
28/10/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1930 |
J69 |
196
|
|
7196
|
8603
|
68603
|
|
08/1900 |
05/03/1958 |
Condenser fitted |
03/1942 |
J69 |
197
|
|
7197
|
(8604)
|
|
|
08/1900 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
04/1940 |
J69 |
198
|
|
7198
|
8605
|
68605
|
|
08/1900 |
04/07/1958 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1937 |
J69 |
160
|
|
7160
|
8607
|
68607
|
|
06/1901 |
05/05/1958 |
Condenser fitted |
07/1940 |
J69 |
162
|
|
7162
|
8609
|
68609
|
|
06/1901 |
16/09/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1935 |
J69 |
163
|
|
7163
|
8610
|
68610
|
|
06/1901 |
07/01/1957 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1926 |
J69 |
165
|
|
7165
|
8612
|
68612
|
|
07/1901 |
26/06/1961 |
Condenser fitted |
07/1940 |
J69 |
166
|
|
7166
|
8613
|
68613
|
|
07/1901 |
17/09/1961 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1939 |
J69 |
167
|
|
7167
|
(8614)
|
|
|
07/1901 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
10/1939 |
J69 |
168
|
|
7168
|
(8615)
|
|
|
08/1901 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
04/1940 |
J69 |
51
|
|
7051
|
8617
|
68617
|
|
05/1904 |
14/07/1958 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1940 |
J69 |
52
|
|
7052
|
8618
|
68618
|
|
05/1904 |
18/08/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1927 |
J69 |
53
|
|
7053
|
8619
|
68619
|
|
05/1904 |
30/10/1961 |
Condenser fitted |
08/1940 |
J69 |
54
|
|
7054
|
(8620)
|
|
|
05/1904 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
10/1939 |
J69 |
55
|
|
7055
|
8621
|
68621
|
|
05/1904 |
16/09/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1937 |
J69 |
57
|
|
7057
|
8623
|
68623
|
|
06/1904 |
14/02/1961 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
10/1928 |
J69 |
58
|
|
7058
|
(8624)
|
|
|
06/1904 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
04/1940 |
J69 |
59
|
|
7059
|
8625
|
68625
|
|
06/1904 |
01/01/1959 |
Condensers removed |
1948 |
J69 |
60
|
|
7060
|
8626
|
68626
|
|
06/1904 |
03/05/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
06/1940 |
J69 |
81
|
|
7081
|
(8627)
|
|
|
08/1904 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
05/1940 |
J69 |
82
|
|
7082
|
8628
|
68628
|
|
08/1904 |
24/02/1958 |
Condensers removed |
09/1935 |
J69 |
83
|
|
7083
|
8629
|
68629
|
|
08/1904 |
26/11/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1929 |
J69 |
84
|
|
7084
|
8630
|
68630
|
|
08/1904 |
01/01/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1928 |
J69 |
85
|
|
7085
|
8631
|
68631
|
|
08/1904 |
28/07/1958 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1928 |
J69 |
86
|
|
7086
|
8632
|
68632
|
|
09/1904 |
08/05/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1927 |
J69 |
87
|
|
7087
|
8633
|
68633
|
|
09/1904 |
24/11/1960 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1939 |
J69 |
88
|
|
7088
|
(8634)
|
|
|
09/1904 |
10/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
10/1939 |
J69 |
89
|
|
7089
|
8635
|
68635
|
|
09/1904 |
16/09/1962 |
Condensers removed |
04/1928 |
J69 |
90
|
|
7090
|
8636
|
68636
|
|
09/1904 |
01/01/1959 |
Condensers removed |
03/1930 |