Depot: Alnmouth
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Alnmouth | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1563 | on | 24/08/1938 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 08/09/1943 | Twd | on | 29/09/1946 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1429 | on | 08/01/1930 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 22/03/1945 | Twd | on | 29/09/1946 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4815 | on | 29/09/1946 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 13/04/1947 | Twd | on | 11/11/1956 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4924 | on | 29/09/1946 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 13/04/1947 | Twd | on | 23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4868 | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 26/10/1947 | Twd | w/e | 17/04/1948 | MLP | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4868 | on | 18/04/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 16/05/1948 | Twd | w/e | 22/05/1948 | ALN | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76024 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 52E | Percy Main | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 52d | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 52c | Alston |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64897 | on | 04/01/1953 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 28/03/1954 | 52d | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64916 | on | 19/09/1954 | 52B | Heaton | on | 26/06/1955 | 52d | on | 25/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64705 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 16/06/1957 | 52d | on | 25/01/1959 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64929 | on | 04/01/1953 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 16/06/1957 | 52d | on | 23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64949 | on | 16/06/1957 | 52B | Heaton | on | 11/05/1958 | 52d | on | 22/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64814 | on | 08/10/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 08/04/1962 | 52d | on | 23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64869 | on | 08/10/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 08/04/1962 | 52d | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64910 | on | 15/01/1961 | 52B | Heaton | on | 19/08/1962 | 52d | on | 23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64917 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 09/09/1962 | 52d | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61019 | on | 11/09/1960 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | on | 24/02/1963 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61022 | on | 10/09/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | on | 24/02/1963 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61025 | on | 12/06/1960 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | on | 02/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62006 | on | 23/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | on | 19/06/1966 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62023 | on | 23/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | on | 19/06/1966 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62025 | on | 23/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | on | 19/06/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62030 | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | on | 28/02/1965 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62021 | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 25/11/1962 | 52d | on | 19/06/1966 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62011 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 63D | Fort William | on | 02/12/1962 | 52d | on | 19/06/1966 | SBH | Blyth (South) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62012 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 63D | Fort William | on | 02/12/1962 | 52d | on | 06/09/1964 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62050 | on | 06/05/1962 | 52K | Consett | on | 01/11/1964 | 52d | on | 19/06/1966 | 52F | Blyth (North) |