|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 02/06/1931 | 12/06/1931 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/09/1931 | 20/10/1931 | 37 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/07/1932 | 28/07/1932 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1933 | 04/11/1933 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1935 | 19/07/1935 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1936 | 05/08/1936 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1940 | 02/02/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 1904 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1941 | 26/11/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2625 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/12/1944 | 06/01/1945 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2124 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/01/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 74 days | General | Boiler number BP130 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/11/1948 | 25/12/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64814 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/07/1951 | 11/08/1951 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/04/1954 | 29/05/1954 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27501 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 01/12/1954 | 14/01/1955 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/04/1956 | 19/05/1956 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/06/1958 | 05/07/1958 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 27551 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1959 | 17/08/1959 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1959 | 09/12/1959 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/06/1960 | 30/06/1960 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1961 | 02/06/1961 | 19 days | Light Casual | Not repaired |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/03/1953 | Alston Branch | The 2.0 p.m. train to Haltwhistle was in charge of G5 67315 of 52C, While J39 No. 64814, also of 52C, was outside the shed. Quite a fair amount of freight appears to move over the branch in addition to the six passenger trips each way, with an extra in both directions on Saturdays. | SLS/195304 |
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1466 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1486 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
02/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1931. Dep: 12/06/1931. | ||
14/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1931. Dep: 20/10/1931. | ||
19/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/07/1932. Dep: 28/07/1932. | ||
26/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/07/1935. Dep: 19/07/1935. | ||
10/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1936. Dep: 05/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1940. Dep: 02/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1904 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1941. Dep: 26/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2625 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2124 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4814 | ||
08/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP130 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1948. Dep: 25/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64814 |
||
04/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/07/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951. | ||
22/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27501 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1954. Dep: 14/01/1955. | ||
17/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/04/1956. Dep: 19/05/1956. | ||
12/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27551 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
02/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/07/1959. Dep: 17/08/1959. | ||
24/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/11/1959. Dep: 09/12/1959. | ||
16/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/06/1960. Dep: 30/06/1960. | ||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
15/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1961. Dep: 02/06/1961. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
30/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
08/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
08/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64814 from Alnmouth (52D.1) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |