Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 792 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 2653 Week
» 23635 Month
» 165589 Year
» 1049970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Fort William


Depot Details
Depot Name Fort William
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
FW187531/01/1950
63D01/02/195030/04/1955
65J01/05/195531/05/1960
63B01/06/196030/06/1970
65H01/07/197005/05/1973
FW06/05/1973
Big 4 Company LNER
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line east of the station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left over a level crossing at the north end of the station platforms, and turn right almost immediately along a narrow path running between the line and the sea wall. This leads to the shed.
Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to FW
01/02/1950Change of code to 63D
01/05/1955Change of code to 65J
01/06/1960Change of code to 63B
01/07/1970Change of code to 65H
06/05/1973Change of code to FW