|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/03/1938 | 11/03/1938 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1939 | 23/09/1939 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1941 | 05/01/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number BP135 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/09/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1947 | 07/02/1948 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/07/1951 | 16/08/1951 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64924 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/05/1953 | 01/06/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 27507 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/03/1956 | 09/04/1956 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/04/1956 | 26/05/1956 | 40 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/12/1958 | 16/01/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2699 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/03/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1563 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6821 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
25/04/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ferryhill (Co. Durham) (FER) | ||
07/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1938. Dep: 11/03/1938. | ||
24/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
20/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 05/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP135 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (Twd) | ||
23/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4924 | ||
29/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (Twd) | ||
04/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1947. Dep: 07/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27487 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/07/1951. Dep: 16/08/1951. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64924 |
||
08/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1953. Dep: 01/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27507 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1956. Dep: 09/04/1956. | ||
17/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/04/1956. Dep: 26/05/1956. | ||
19/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1958. Dep: 16/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2699 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64924 from Alnmouth (52D.1) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |