30/06/1949 |
Queens Park Works |
Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 62004/05(10/6), 62006(15/6), 62007(17/6), 62008(21/6), 62009(23/6), 62010(27/6), 62011(29/6) and 62012(W/E 2/7). Works' Nos. checked are:-Nos. 62001-12(26605-16/49). |
SLS/194908 |
03/07/1949 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 3/7, new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's, Nos. 62005, 62007-12, were on the shed, and a number of ex L.N.E.R. locomotives were observed with the Power Classification painted on the cab sides. |
SLS/194908 |
12/06/1954 |
Scottish Miscellany |
On 12th June, No. 57460 was working the Killin branch. The following day, the 13th, L.M.S. Class 5's were well in evidence at Fort William; engines on the shed were Nos. 44968, 45245, 45367, 61787, 62011, 62031, 61994/5. Nos. 44928 an 44991 arrived on an eight-coach train. Opinion of the Stanier Blacks was that they were good engines, but spoilt by the injectors, which have been giving a considerable amount of trouble. On 26th June No. 40151 was noted at Aviemore, a N.B.R. 4-4-0 (Glen?) passed Newtonmore in the down direction with a twelve-wheeled coach. No. 42130 was banking from Blair Atholl, while No. 77008 was on the shed. No B.R. Class 5 engines were seen, all trains being handled by Staniers, either singly or in pairs. 54398 'Ben Alder' is still lying at the back of Lochgorm Works. |
SLS/195408 |
23/04/1961 |
Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) |
New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. |
SLS/196106 |
21/08/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Crimpsall Steam Bay) |
New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. |
SLS/196309 |
02/07/1967 |
Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Tyne Dock) |
Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). |
SLS/196708 |