|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 10/04/1940 | 09/05/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number C1720 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1941 | 18/09/1941 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1943 | 10/02/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2597 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/12/1944 | 04/01/1945 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/06/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number C1717 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4949 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/10/1948 | 26/11/1948 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27533 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64949 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/04/1951 | 12/05/1951 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/11/1952 | 22/11/1952 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/03/1954 | 16/04/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27511 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/04/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1896 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1746 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
10/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1940. Dep: 09/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1720 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
25/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1941. Dep: 18/09/1941. | ||
08/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1943. Dep: 10/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2597 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
12/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1944. Dep: 04/01/1945. | ||
08/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1717 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4949 |
||
04/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
10/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
24/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
28/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1948. Dep: 26/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27533 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64949 |
||
20/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
20/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/04/1951. Dep: 12/05/1951. | ||
04/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 22/11/1952. | ||
17/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1954. Dep: 16/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27511 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
01/12/1956 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 27592 boiler fitted | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
11/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
22/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64949 from Alnmouth (52D.1) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |