BR Standard Riddles "Std 3MT Tank" Class 2-6-2T
Class | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BR3/2 | 82000 | 04/04/1952 | 84E 84E 88C 88F 84G 84K 89C 9H W |
Tyseley Tyseley Barry Treherbert Shrewsbury Wrexham Rhosddu Machynlleth Patricroft Withdrawn |
04/04/1952 19/04/1952 08/08/1953 03/10/1953 03/12/1955 24/01/1959 27/02/1960 03/04/1965 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82001 | 18/04/1952 | 84E 84E 84E 84E 88C 83A 88F 82A 6E 6A 82G 86C 72A 83B 82E W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Barry Newton Abbot Treherbert Bristol Bath Road Chester West Chester (MR) Templecombe (S&D) Hereford Exmouth Junction Taunton Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
18/04/1952 19/04/1952 14/06/1952 16/05/1953 03/10/1953 16/07/1955 06/10/1956 22/03/1958 09/08/1958 09/04/1960 23/04/1961 08/09/1962 04/05/1963 28/12/1963 22/06/1964 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82002 | 28/04/1952 | 84E 84E 84E 84E 88C 83A 88F 82A 6E 6A 82G 89A 86C 72A W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Barry Newton Abbot Treherbert Bristol Bath Road Chester West Chester (MR) Templecombe (S&D) Shrewsbury Hereford Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
28/04/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 16/05/1953 03/10/1953 16/07/1955 06/10/1956 17/05/1958 09/08/1958 09/04/1960 23/04/1961 04/11/1961 06/10/1962 04/05/1963 07/02/1964 |
07/02/1964 |
BR3/2 | 82003 | 02/05/1952 | 84E 84E 84E 84E 88C 82A 6E 6A 82E 82B 87G 89C 9H W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Barry Bristol Bath Road Chester West Chester (MR) Bristol Barrow Road St Philips Marsh Carmarthen Machynlleth Patricroft Withdrawn |
02/05/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 16/05/1953 03/10/1953 22/03/1958 09/08/1958 09/04/1960 23/04/1961 24/02/1962 24/03/1962 16/06/1962 03/04/1965 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82004 | 14/05/1952 | 84E 84E 88C 83A 84H 84G 84H 82F W |
Tyseley Tyseley Barry Newton Abbot Wellington Shrewsbury Wellington Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
14/05/1952 17/05/1952 03/10/1953 23/04/1955 11/08/1956 13/06/1959 05/09/1959 31/10/1959 01/10/1965 |
01/10/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82005 | 16/05/1952 | 84E 84E 88C 83A 88F 82A 6E 6A 89A 89C 89C 70A W |
Tyseley Tyseley Barry Newton Abbot Treherbert Bristol Bath Road Chester West Chester (MR) Shrewsbury Machynlleth Machynlleth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
16/05/1952 17/05/1952 03/10/1953 16/07/1955 08/09/1956 14/06/1958 09/08/1958 09/04/1960 23/04/1961 15/07/1961 02/12/1961 01/05/1965 19/09/1965 |
19/09/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82006 | 27/05/1952 | 84E 84E 88C 83A 84H 82A 82E 89C 70A W |
Tyseley Tyseley Barry Newton Abbot Wellington Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road Machynlleth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
27/05/1952 14/06/1952 03/10/1953 16/07/1955 11/08/1956 30/01/1960 10/09/1960 25/02/1961 01/05/1965 18/09/1966 |
18/09/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82007 | 30/05/1952 | 84E 84E 88C 88F 84G 84H 84D 84K 85A 82A 82E 82B 82E W |
Tyseley Tyseley Barry Treherbert Shrewsbury Wellington Leamington Wrexham Rhosddu Worcester Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
30/05/1952 14/06/1952 03/10/1953 16/07/1955 03/12/1955 12/06/1958 14/06/1958 09/08/1958 06/09/1958 04/10/1958 10/09/1960 25/02/1961 03/11/1962 29/06/1964 |
25/06/1964 |
BR3/2 | 82008 | 05/06/1952 | 84E 84E 88C 85D 85A 85D 85A 89C 87H 83B W |
Tyseley Tyseley Barry Kidderminster Worcester Kidderminster Worcester Machynlleth Neyland Taunton Withdrawn |
05/06/1952 14/06/1952 03/10/1953 10/09/1955 07/09/1957 30/11/1957 25/01/1958 15/07/1961 07/10/1961 04/11/1961 07/02/1964 |
07/02/1964 |
BR3/2 | 82009 | 13/06/1952 | 84E 84E 88C 83A 84H 84G 84H 82A 82E 82B 89C 9H W |
Tyseley Tyseley Barry Newton Abbot Wellington Shrewsbury Wellington Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road St Philips Marsh Machynlleth Patricroft Withdrawn |
13/06/1952 14/06/1952 03/10/1953 23/04/1955 08/09/1956 13/06/1959 05/09/1959 30/01/1960 10/09/1960 08/10/1960 25/02/1961 03/04/1965 05/11/1966 |
05/11/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82010 | 25/06/1952 | 72A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
25/06/1952 24/09/1962 24/04/1965 |
24/04/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82011 | 01/07/1952 | 72A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/07/1952 24/09/1962 30/08/1964 |
30/08/1964 |
BR3/2 | 82012 | 04/07/1952 | 72A 71A 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
04/07/1952 14/02/1953 17/12/1962 31/05/1964 |
31/05/1964 |
BR3/2 | 82013 | 09/07/1952 | 72A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
09/07/1952 24/09/1962 14/06/1964 |
14/06/1964 |
BR3/2 | 82014 | 01/08/1952 | 71A 71A 71A 70A W |
Eastleigh Eastleigh Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/08/1952 07/10/1952 26/05/1953 17/12/1962 31/05/1964 |
31/05/1964 |
BR3/2 | 82015 | 13/08/1952 | 71A 71A 70C 70A W |
Eastleigh Eastleigh Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
13/08/1952 07/10/1952 17/12/1962 01/04/1963 06/12/1964 |
06/12/1964 |
BR3/2 | 82016 | 21/08/1952 | 71A 71A 70C 70A W |
Eastleigh Eastleigh Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
21/08/1952 07/10/1952 17/12/1962 01/04/1963 25/04/1965 |
25/04/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82017 | 08/08/1952 | 72A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
08/08/1952 24/09/1962 25/04/1965 |
25/04/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82018 | 08/09/1952 | 72A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
08/09/1952 24/09/1962 10/07/1966 |
10/07/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82019 | 26/09/1952 | 72A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
26/09/1952 24/09/1962 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR3/2 | 82020 | 29/09/1954 | 72A 2B 6E 84G 89C 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Nuneaton Wrexham Rhosddu Shrewsbury Machynlleth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
29/09/1954 09/10/1954 03/11/1956 30/01/1960 26/03/1960 01/05/1965 19/09/1965 |
19/09/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82021 | 06/10/1954 | 72A 2B 6E 84G 89C 6H 6F 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Nuneaton Wrexham Rhosddu Shrewsbury Machynlleth Bangor Machynlleth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
06/10/1954 09/10/1954 03/11/1956 30/01/1960 26/03/1960 20/06/1964 27/06/1964 01/05/1965 17/10/1965 |
17/10/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82022 | 15/10/1954 | 72A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
15/10/1954 24/09/1962 17/10/1965 |
17/10/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82023 | 22/10/1954 | 72A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
22/10/1954 24/09/1962 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82024 | 29/10/1954 | 72A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
29/10/1954 24/09/1962 30/01/1966 |
30/01/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82025 | 05/11/1954 | 72A 71A W |
Exmouth Junction Eastleigh Withdrawn |
05/11/1954 24/09/1962 09/08/1964 |
09/08/1964 |
BR3/2 | 82026 | 12/11/1954 | 51H 51A 50E 56F 56C 70C 70F 70A W |
Kirkby Stephen Darlington Scarborough Low Moor Copley Hill (Leeds) Guildford Bournemouth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
12/11/1954 08/02/1958 11/10/1958 08/12/1962 06/04/1963 14/09/1963 06/01/1964 14/09/1964 26/06/1966 |
26/06/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82027 | 23/11/1954 | 51H 51C 50F 50E 50F 50A 70C 70F 70A W |
Kirkby Stephen West Hartlepool Malton Scarborough Malton York (North) Guildford Bournemouth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
23/11/1954 08/02/1958 11/10/1958 18/06/1960 22/12/1962 20/04/1963 14/09/1963 06/01/1964 14/09/1964 09/01/1966 |
09/01/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82028 | 02/12/1954 | 51A 50E 50F 50A 70C 70F 70A W |
Darlington Scarborough Malton York (North) Guildford Bournemouth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
02/12/1954 11/10/1958 16/09/1961 20/04/1963 14/09/1963 06/01/1964 14/09/1964 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82029 | 13/12/1954 | 51A 51C 50F 50E 50F 50A 70C 70F 70A W |
Darlington West Hartlepool Malton Scarborough Malton York (North) Guildford Bournemouth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
13/12/1954 08/02/1958 11/10/1958 18/06/1960 16/09/1961 20/04/1963 14/09/1963 06/01/1964 14/09/1964 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR3/2 | 82030 | 21/12/1954 | 88C 84G 85A 82A 85A 85D 85A 84H 82A 82E 83B 83D 85B 82F W |
Barry Shrewsbury Worcester Bristol Bath Road Worcester Kidderminster Worcester Wellington Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road Taunton Exmouth Junction Gloucester Horton Road Bath Green Park (S&D) (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
21/12/1954 21/05/1955 31/12/1955 18/04/1959 16/05/1959 13/06/1959 11/07/1959 31/10/1959 30/01/1960 10/09/1960 04/11/1961 22/06/1964 13/06/1965 02/08/1965 22/11/1965 03/01/1966 |
31/12/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82031 | 30/12/1954 | 88C 83D 83A 84G 84K 89C 6H 9H W |
Barry Laira Newton Abbot Shrewsbury Wrexham Rhosddu Machynlleth Bangor Patricroft Withdrawn |
30/12/1954 29/01/1955 26/03/1955 21/05/1955 24/01/1959 30/01/1960 20/06/1964 03/04/1965 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82032 | 01/01/1955 | 88C 83A 88F 88A 82A 6E 6A 89A 89C 89A 6H W |
Barry Newton Abbot Treherbert Radyr Bristol Bath Road Chester West Chester (MR) Shrewsbury Machynlleth Shrewsbury Bangor Withdrawn |
01/01/1955 16/07/1955 06/10/1956 22/03/1958 17/05/1958 09/08/1958 09/04/1960 23/04/1961 12/08/1961 02/12/1961 27/06/1964 01/05/1965 |
01/05/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82033 | 13/01/1955 | 83A 88F 88A 82A 82E 89C 6H 70A W |
Newton Abbot Treherbert Radyr Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road Machynlleth Bangor Nine Elms Withdrawn |
13/01/1955 06/10/1956 22/03/1958 17/05/1958 10/09/1960 31/12/1960 20/06/1964 01/05/1965 19/09/1965 |
19/09/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82034 | 28/01/1955 | 83A 84H 88F 88A 82A 6E 6A 89C 9H W |
Newton Abbot Wellington Treherbert Radyr Bristol Bath Road Chester West Chester (MR) Machynlleth Patricroft Withdrawn |
28/01/1955 08/09/1956 06/10/1956 22/03/1958 17/05/1958 09/08/1958 09/04/1960 23/04/1961 03/04/1965 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR3/2 | 82035 | 03/03/1955 | 88C 82A 82E 82B 82E 82E 83D 83E W |
Barry Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Exmouth Junction Yeovil Town Withdrawn |
03/03/1955 17/05/1958 10/09/1960 24/02/1962 03/11/1962 28/12/1963 13/04/1964 12/10/1964 06/08/1965 |
06/08/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82036 | 01/04/1955 | 88C 88A 82A 6E 6A 89C 89A 82B 82E W |
Barry Radyr Bristol Bath Road Chester West Chester (MR) Machynlleth Shrewsbury St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
01/04/1955 22/03/1958 17/05/1958 09/08/1958 09/04/1960 23/04/1961 02/12/1961 14/07/1962 03/11/1962 21/07/1965 |
21/07/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82037 | 20/04/1955 | 87K 88C 88E 88C 88A 82A 82F 84K 82A 82E 82B 82E W |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Barry Abercynon Barry Radyr Bristol Bath Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Wrexham Rhosddu Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
20/04/1955 16/07/1955 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 19/04/1958 17/05/1958 12/06/1958 24/01/1959 30/01/1960 10/09/1960 24/02/1962 03/11/1962 25/08/1965 |
25/08/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82038 | 04/05/1955 | 83A 84G 85A 84H 82A 82B 82E W |
Newton Abbot Shrewsbury Worcester Wellington Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
04/05/1955 08/10/1955 03/12/1955 03/10/1959 30/01/1960 10/09/1960 03/11/1962 06/09/1965 |
06/08/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82039 | 10/05/1955 | 88C 82A 82G 82E 82B 82E 83D 85B W |
Barry Bristol Bath Road Templecombe (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Exmouth Junction Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
10/05/1955 17/05/1958 24/01/1959 10/09/1960 24/02/1962 03/11/1962 13/04/1964 13/06/1965 02/07/1965 |
02/07/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82040 | 19/05/1955 | 88C 82A 82E 82B 82E 83D 85B W |
Barry Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Exmouth Junction Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
19/05/1955 12/06/1958 10/09/1960 24/02/1962 03/11/1962 02/11/1963 13/06/1965 02/07/1965 |
02/07/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82041 | 17/06/1955 | 88C 82A 82F W |
Barry Bristol Bath Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
17/06/1955 12/06/1958 21/03/1959 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82042 | 20/06/1955 | 88C 82A 82E 87H 83B 83D 85B W |
Barry Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road Neyland Taunton Exmouth Junction Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
20/06/1955 09/08/1958 08/10/1960 07/10/1961 04/11/1961 22/06/1964 13/06/1965 06/09/1965 |
06/08/1965 |
BR3/2 | 82043 | 27/06/1955 | 88C 82A 82E 82B 82E W |
Barry Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
27/06/1955 12/06/1958 08/10/1960 24/02/1962 03/11/1962 07/02/1964 |
07/02/1964 |
BR3/2 | 82044 | 12/08/1955 | 88C 82A 82E 87H 83B 83D 85B 82F W |
Barry Bristol Bath Road Bristol Barrow Road Neyland Taunton Exmouth Junction Gloucester Horton Road Bath Green Park (S&D) (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
12/08/1955 12/06/1958 10/09/1960 07/10/1961 04/11/1961 22/06/1964 13/06/1965 02/08/1965 20/09/1965 18/11/1965 |
18/11/1965 |