|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1959 | Fawley branch | On 24th August 82012/15 were observed on an up petrol train and 80031 was shunting. It is proposed to run block petrol trains from Fawley to Bromford bridge and to accommodate this traffic, extensive improvements are to be made to the crossing and siding facilities. | SLS/195910 |
05/03/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 32107, 34078, 35007/26, 76059/62. Erecting Shop: D2274, D3465, E5004/6/17, 15233, 30106, 30254, 30501/6/13/20, 30667, 30863, 32300, 32662, 34062/96/7, 34108, 35016/7/20, 41318, 73019, 73117, 75066/71, 76007/65, 80018/43/81, 82015, Longmoor Military Rly. 600. Behind Boiler Shop: 15202/28, 30826. Scrap Road: 30031, 30128. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/08/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 82015 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
||
07/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
17/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
01/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
06/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 82015 | ||
04/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |