Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
82012 |
on |
04/07/1952 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1959 |
Fawley branch |
On 24th August 82012/15 were observed on an up petrol train and 80031 was shunting. It is proposed to run block petrol trains from Fawley to Bromford bridge and to accommodate this traffic, extensive improvements are to be made to the crossing and siding facilities. |
SLS/195910 |
17/08/1964 |
Standard 2-6-2T\'s working after withrawal! |
82012/3 have been noted working although withdrawn. |
SLS/196409 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 82012 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
31/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 82012 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|