Scrap Merchant: R A Kings
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6109 | 06/1931 | 29/08/1962 | 31.227 | |||||
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63863 | 08/1919 | 20/06/1965 | 45.879 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |||
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63650 | 03/1918 | 27/06/1965 | 47.318 | 41J | Langwith Junction | |||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61282 | 28/01/1948 | 16/09/1962 | 14.644 | 0.332 | 34E | New England | 01/1963 | 14.975 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61364 | 19/04/1950 | 16/09/1962 | 12.419 | 0.416 | 34E | New England | 02/1963 | 12.836 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5099 | 25/05/1946 | 11/02/1963 | 16.729 | 0.592 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 09/1963 | 17.321 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5065 | 02/07/1937 | 07/01/1963 | 25.534 | 0.937 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 12/1963 | 26.471 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7030 | 05/06/1950 | 01/02/1963 | 12.668 | 0.868 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 12/1963 | 13.537 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61074 | 07/09/1946 | 04/09/1963 | 17.003 | 0.364 | 34E | New England | 01/1964 | 17.367 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61006 | 17/03/1944 | 22/09/1963 | 19.529 | 0.315 | 40A | Lincoln | 01/1964 | 19.844 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61409 | 15/06/1950 | 22/09/1963 | 13.279 | 0.315 | 40A | Lincoln | 01/1964 | 13.595 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7017 | 24/08/1948 | 11/02/1963 | 14.477 | 0.926 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 01/1964 | 15.403 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61331 | 25/06/1948 | 22/09/1963 | 15.252 | 0.334 | 34E | New England | 22/01/1964 | 15.586 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61318 | 11/05/1948 | 22/09/1963 | 15.375 | 0.400 | 40B | Immingham | 02/1964 | 15.775 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61073 | 06/09/1946 | 22/09/1963 | 17.055 | 0.400 | 34E | New England | 02/1964 | 17.455 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4095 | 16/06/1926 | 12/12/1962 | 36.515 | 1.342 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 04/1964 | 37.858 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61252 | 06/11/1947 | 25/11/1963 | 16.063 | 0.556 | 31B | March | 06/1964 | 16.619 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61109 | 18/12/1946 | 12/07/1964 | 17.578 | 0.093 | 34E | New England | 08/1964 | 17.671 |
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76028 | 10/1953 | 10/05/1964 | 10.575 | 0.266 | 08/1964 | 10.841 | ||
Steam | SR | Q | 0-6-0 | 30546 | 06/1939 | 10/05/1964 | 24.921 | 0.600 | 12/1964 | 25.521 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61205 | 24/06/1947 | 25/11/1963 | 16.433 | 1.227 | 31B | March | 02/1965 | 17.660 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61097 | 15/11/1946 | 03/01/1965 | 18.148 | 0.118 | 34E | New England | 02/1965 | 18.266 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61204 | 19/06/1947 | 25/11/1963 | 16.447 | 2.304 | 31B | March | 03/1966 | 18.751 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61105 | 09/12/1946 | 26/12/1964 | 18.060 | 1.551 | 34E | New England | 07/1966 | 19.611 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61194 | 21/05/1947 | 29/08/1965 | 18.288 | 0.962 | 40E | Colwick | 08/1966 | 19.249 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61040 | 16/04/1946 | 10/07/1966 | 20.247 | 0.099 | 56A | Wakefield | 08/1966 | 20.345 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90068 | 06/1944 | 10/07/1966 | 22.082 | 0.266 | 10/1966 | 22.348 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80013 | 28/08/1951 | 19/09/1966 | 15.071 | 0.156 | 11/1966 | 15.227 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75077 | 29/12/1955 | 09/07/1967 | 11.534 | 0.268 | 10/1967 | 11.803 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75075 | 25/11/1955 | 09/07/1967 | 11.627 | 0.268 | 10/1967 | 11.896 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75074 | 18/11/1955 | 09/07/1967 | 11.647 | 0.268 | 10/1967 | 11.915 | ||
Diesel | BR | DES1 | 0-6-0 | 15000 | 12/08/1944 | 05/08/1967 | 22.995 | 1.030 | 5B | Crewe South | 08/1968 | 24.025 |
Diesel | BR | DES1 | 0-6-0 | 15002 | 22/03/1945 | 05/08/1967 | 22.386 | 1.197 | 5B | Crewe South | 10/1968 | 23.584 |
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2210 | 25/09/1954 | 03/05/1970 | 15.614 | 0.200 | 07/1970 | 15.814 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2240 | 03/06/1956 | 20/04/1968 | 11.888 | 2.488 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 10/1970 | 14.375 |
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8507 | 30/10/1962 | 31/12/1971 | 9.175 | 3.710 | 66A | Polmadie | 09/1975 | 12.885 |
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8508 | 30/10/1962 | 31/12/1971 | 9.175 | 3.710 | 66A | Polmadie | 09/1975 | 12.885 |
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8516 | 19/04/1963 | 06/10/1971 | 8.471 | 3.945 | 09/1975 | 12.416 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8525 | 14/08/1963 | 06/10/1971 | 8.151 | 3.945 | 09/1975 | 12.096 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8529 | 17/05/1963 | 31/12/1971 | 8.630 | 3.710 | 66A | Polmadie | 09/1975 | 12.340 |
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8531 | 08/05/1963 | 21/09/1971 | 8.378 | 3.986 | 09/1975 | 12.364 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8536 | 29/08/1963 | 31/12/1971 | 8.345 | 3.710 | 66A | Polmadie | 09/1975 | 12.055 |
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8552 | 17/10/1963 | 31/12/1971 | 8.211 | 3.710 | 66A | Polmadie | 09/1975 | 11.921 |
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8574 | 30/01/1964 | 31/12/1971 | 7.923 | 3.710 | 66A | Polmadie | 09/1975 | 11.633 |
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8580 | 11/03/1964 | 06/10/1971 | 7.575 | 3.945 | 09/1975 | 11.521 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8539 | 12/06/1963 | 06/10/1971 | 8.323 | 4.195 | 12/1975 | 12.518 |