Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1021 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6805 Week
» 28194 Month
» 147721 Year
» 3174574 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: New England
Depot Details
Depot Name |
New England |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | NWE | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 35A | 01/02/1950 | 31/01/1958 | 34E | 01/02/1958 | 30/09/1968 |
|
Date Opened |
1852 |
Date Closed |
01/1965 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line 1½ miles north of Peterborough North Station. The yard is partially visible from the line.
Go straight ahead across the yard outside Peterborough North
Station, and turn left into St. Leonard’s Street. Turn left into Westwood Street, and continue along Walpole Street for about a mile.
A broad path leads over a footbridge from the left-hand side of this
road (by the junction of Lincoln Road, A15) to the shed. Walking
time 40 minutes.
A bus service operates between Peterborough town and the shed.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1852 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to NWE | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 35A | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 34E | 01/1965 | Depot closed |
|
|
|