|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/06/1951 | 28/07/1951 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28331 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1952 | 27/08/1952 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1953 | 24/09/1953 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28750 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1954 | 29/12/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28861 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1955 | 01/03/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/04/1955 | 20/04/1955 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1956 | 22/03/1956 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1957 | 09/02/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28141 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1957 | 15/02/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1958 | 10/01/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28413 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1960 | 18/01/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28515 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
09/09/1963 | Lincoln MPD | The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/06/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61409 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2111 Allocated to Immingham (40B) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
05/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1951. Dep: 28/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28331 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1952. Dep: 27/08/1952. | ||
13/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1953. Dep: 24/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28750 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1954. Dep: 29/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28861 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 01/03/1955. | ||
09/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1955. Dep: 20/04/1955. | ||
01/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1956. Dep: 22/03/1956. | ||
11/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28141 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1957. Dep: 15/02/1957. | ||
04/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1958. Dep: 10/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28413 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
19/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1960. Dep: 18/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28515 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61409 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |