Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1819 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7603 Week
» 28992 Month
» 148519 Year
» 3175372 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Lincoln
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Lincoln |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | LIN | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 40A | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | LN | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
1875 |
Date Closed |
10/1964 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line, west of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the L.N.E. Station along St. Mary’s Street. Turn
left into High Street, and right into St. Mark’s Lane. Turn right along
the canal, and a footbridge leads across the canal to the shed. Walking
time 5 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to LIN | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 40A | 10/1964 | Depot closed | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to LN |
|
|
|