BR Swindon & Crewe 52 C-C
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Western | 1010 | 15/10/1962 | WESTERN CAMPAIGNER | 15/10/1962 | 28/02/1977 | ||
Western | 1013 | 13/12/1962 | WESTERN RANGER | 13/12/1962 | 28/02/1977 | ||
Western | 1015 | 21/01/1963 | WESTERN CHAMPION | 21/01/1963 | 13/12/1976 | ||
Western | 1023 | 23/09/1963 | WESTERN FUSILIER | 23/09/1963 | 28/02/1977 | ||
Western | 1041 | 10/10/1962 | WESTERN PRINCE | 10/10/1962 | 23/02/1977 | ||
Western | 1048 | 15/12/1962 | WESTERN LADY | 15/12/1962 | 28/02/1977 | ||
Western | 1062 | 06/05/1963 | WESTERN COURIER | 06/05/1963 | 22/08/1974 |