Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 621 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6405 Week
» 27794 Month
» 147321 Year
» 3174174 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1048 |
15/12/1962 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
15/12/1962 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
28/02/1977 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
14 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,368,000 miles |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
15/12/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
14/11/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/07/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/07/1970 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/12/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
09/07/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/12/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1048, name: WESTERN LADY Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
14/11/1966 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/07/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/07/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
28/02/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1048 from Laira (84A) |
|
|