Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19156 Week
» 72172 Month
» 191699 Year
» 3218552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1023 |
23/09/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
23/09/1963 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
28/02/1977 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
13 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,256,000 miles |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
23/09/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
19/12/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/09/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
13/09/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
13/09/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
13/09/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
24/01/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Swindon Works |
26/09/1963 |
n/a |
26/09/1963 |
27/09/1963 |
Unclassified 'B' bogie removed for examination and change. Loco weighed at 107t 1cwt.
|
|
|
|
2 days |
|
|
|
Swindon Works |
10/02/1964 |
136 days |
20/02/1964 |
13/03/1964 |
Unclassified Transmission top casing broken. Axle failure on ultrasonic test.Both engines changed. 'A' transmission changed & both bogies also changed.
|
|
|
|
23 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1023, name: WESTERN FUSILIER Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/09/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1963. Dep: 27/09/1963. Stopped on 26/09/1963 Work undertaken: 'B' bogie removed for examination and change. Loco weighed at 107t 1cwt.
|
|
|
20/02/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1964. Dep: 13/03/1964. Stopped on 10/02/1964 Work undertaken: Transmission top casing broken. Axle failure on ultrasonic test.Both engines changed. 'A' transmission changed & both bogies also changed.
|
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
27/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
19/12/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
13/09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
13/09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
13/09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
28/02/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1023 from Laira (84A) |
|
|