BR Swindon & Crewe 52 C-C
BR (Pre Tops) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
D1000 | 29/12/1961 | 83D 81A 84A 87E 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
29/12/1961 03/11/1962 15/01/1966 18/03/1968 05/10/1971 11/02/1974 |
11/02/1974 |
D1001 | 12/02/1962 | 83D 81A 84A 87E 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
12/02/1962 03/11/1962 13/04/1964 18/03/1968 04/04/1970 04/10/1976 |
04/10/1976 |
D1002 | 19/03/1962 | 83D 81A 82A 84A 87E 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
19/03/1962 03/11/1962 13/04/1964 18/03/1968 01/06/1968 04/04/1970 29/01/1974 |
29/01/1974 |
D1003 | 14/04/1962 | 83D 81A 84A 87E 87E 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Laira Landore Landore Laira Withdrawn |
14/04/1962 03/11/1962 13/04/1964 18/03/1968 14/06/1969 05/10/1971 05/01/1975 |
05/01/1975 |
D1004 | 12/05/1962 | 83D 81A 84A 87E 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
12/05/1962 03/11/1962 13/04/1964 18/03/1968 14/06/1969 01/08/1973 |
01/08/1973 |
D1005 | 18/06/1962 | 83D 81A 84A 87E 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
18/06/1962 03/11/1962 13/04/1964 18/03/1968 15/03/1969 16/11/1976 |
16/11/1976 |
D1006 | 06/07/1962 | 83D 81A 86A 82A 87E 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Landore Laira Withdrawn |
06/07/1962 03/11/1962 25/01/1964 22/06/1964 18/03/1968 15/03/1969 06/04/1975 |
06/04/1975 |
D1007 | 01/08/1962 | 83D 81A 86A 87E 86A 84A 87E 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
01/08/1962 06/10/1962 25/01/1964 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 18/03/1968 25/01/1969 29/01/1974 |
29/01/1974 |
D1008 | 04/09/1962 | 83D 81A 86A 87E 86A 84A 87E 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
04/09/1962 06/10/1962 25/01/1964 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 18/03/1968 25/01/1969 21/10/1974 |
21/10/1974 |
D1009 | 24/09/1962 | 81A 84A 87E 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Laira Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
24/09/1962 22/02/1964 18/03/1968 25/01/1969 04/04/1970 05/10/1971 10/11/1976 |
10/11/1976 |
D1010 | 15/10/1962 | 81A 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
15/10/1962 25/01/1964 18/03/1968 25/01/1969 28/02/1977 |
28/02/1977 |
D1011 | 27/10/1962 | 81A 86A 87E 86A 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
27/10/1962 28/09/1963 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 01/06/1968 25/01/1969 06/10/1975 |
06/10/1975 |
D1012 | 17/11/1962 | 88A 87E 86A 84A 87E 82A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Landore Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
17/11/1962 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 18/03/1968 25/01/1969 15/03/1969 02/11/1975 |
02/11/1975 |
D1013 | 13/12/1962 | 88A 81A 88A 87E 86A 84A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
13/12/1962 06/04/1963 04/05/1963 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 01/06/1968 05/10/1971 28/02/1977 |
28/02/1977 |
D1014 | 24/12/1962 | 88A 81A 88A 87E 86A 84A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
24/12/1962 06/04/1963 04/05/1963 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 01/06/1968 09/11/1968 06/08/1974 |
06/08/1974 |
D1015 | 21/01/1963 | 88A 81A 88A 81A 84A 81A 84A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Laira Old Oak Common Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
21/01/1963 06/04/1963 29/06/1963 28/09/1963 25/01/1964 25/01/1964 22/02/1964 25/01/1969 05/10/1971 13/12/1976 |
13/12/1976 |
D1016 | 16/02/1963 | 88A 87E 86A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
16/02/1963 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 29/12/1975 |
29/12/1975 |
D1017 | 15/03/1963 | 88A 87E 86A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
15/03/1963 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 01/08/1973 |
01/08/1973 |
D1018 | 02/04/1963 | 81A 86A 87E 86A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
02/04/1963 28/09/1963 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 04/06/1973 |
04/06/1973 |
D1019 | 02/05/1963 | 81A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Laira Withdrawn |
02/05/1963 13/04/1964 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D1020 | 21/05/1963 | 81A 82A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
21/05/1963 04/05/1964 15/03/1969 04/06/1973 |
04/06/1973 |
D1021 | 17/06/1963 | 81A 86A 82A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
17/06/1963 28/09/1963 22/06/1964 15/03/1969 10/08/1976 |
10/08/1976 |
D1022 | 16/07/1963 | 81A 86A 87E 86A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
16/07/1963 28/09/1963 07/03/1965 27/03/1966 01/05/1966 18/01/1977 |
18/01/1977 |
D1023 | 23/09/1963 | 86A 87E 86A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
23/09/1963 07/03/1965 27/03/1966 01/05/1966 28/02/1977 |
28/02/1977 |
D1024 | 01/10/1963 | 86A 82A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
01/10/1963 22/06/1964 03/05/1969 18/11/1973 |
18/11/1973 |
D1025 | 01/11/1963 | 86A 84A 82A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Laira Bristol Bath Road Landore Laira Withdrawn |
01/11/1963 01/05/1966 15/01/1967 25/01/1969 05/10/1971 06/10/1975 |
06/10/1975 |
D1026 | 24/12/1963 | 81A 86A 84A 82A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Landore Laira Withdrawn |
24/12/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 31/03/1967 25/01/1969 05/10/1971 06/10/1975 |
06/10/1975 |
D1027 | 28/01/1964 | 84A 82A 84A W |
Laira (New) Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
28/01/1964 30/10/1966 16/10/1971 02/11/1975 |
02/11/1975 |
D1028 | 25/02/1964 | 82C 84A W |
Swindon (New) Laira Withdrawn |
25/02/1964 14/06/1969 06/10/1976 |
06/10/1976 |
D1029 | 20/04/1964 | 82A 84A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Laira Withdrawn |
20/04/1964 16/10/1971 18/11/1974 |
18/11/1974 |
D1030 | 05/12/1963 | 81A 83A 84A 82A 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Newton Abbot Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
05/12/1963 13/04/1964 11/07/1965 30/10/1966 03/05/1969 04/04/1970 05/10/1971 19/04/1976 |
19/04/1976 |
D1031 | 20/12/1963 | 81A 83A 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Newton Abbot Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
20/12/1963 13/04/1964 11/07/1965 09/11/1968 05/10/1971 01/02/1975 |
01/02/1975 |
D1032 | 31/12/1963 | 81A 83A 84A 82A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Newton Abbot Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
31/12/1963 13/04/1964 11/07/1965 14/06/1969 16/10/1971 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1973 |
D1033 | 17/01/1964 | 81A 83A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Newton Abbot Laira Withdrawn |
17/01/1964 13/04/1964 11/07/1965 17/09/1976 |
17/09/1976 |
D1034 | 15/04/1964 | 81A 84A 82A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
15/04/1964 15/01/1966 03/05/1969 16/10/1971 06/10/1975 |
06/10/1975 |
D1035 | 27/07/1962 | 83D 81A 82A 88A 81A 84A 82A 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
27/07/1962 03/11/1962 12/01/1963 09/02/1963 06/04/1963 13/04/1964 04/04/1970 05/10/1971 05/01/1975 |
05/01/1975 |
D1036 | 29/08/1962 | 83D 81A 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Laira Withdrawn |
29/08/1962 03/11/1962 15/01/1966 01/11/1976 |
01/11/1976 |
D1037 | 31/08/1962 | 83D 81A 88A 87E 86A 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
31/08/1962 03/11/1962 04/05/1963 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 24/05/1976 |
24/05/1976 |
D1038 | 07/09/1962 | 83D 81A 88A 87E 86A 84A 82A 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
07/09/1962 03/11/1962 04/05/1963 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 03/05/1969 16/10/1971 08/10/1973 |
08/10/1973 |
D1039 | 07/09/1962 | 83D 81A 88A 83D 86A 83A 84A W |
Laira (New) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Newton Abbot Laira Withdrawn |
07/09/1962 03/11/1962 06/04/1963 01/06/1963 28/09/1963 22/06/1964 11/07/1965 21/07/1973 |
21/07/1973 |
D1040 | 20/09/1962 | 81A 88A 87E 86A 84A 82A 84A R W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Reinstated Withdrawn |
20/09/1962 06/04/1963 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 25/01/1969 14/06/1969 05/10/1975 09/10/1975 29/02/1976 |
29/02/1976 |
D1041 | 10/10/1962 | 81A 88A 81A 82A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Laira Withdrawn |
10/10/1962 06/04/1963 28/09/1963 25/01/1964 01/06/1968 09/11/1968 23/02/1977 |
23/02/1977 |
D1042 | 19/10/1962 | 81A 88A 87E 86A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
19/10/1962 06/04/1963 07/03/1965 20/02/1966 01/05/1966 21/07/1973 |
21/07/1973 |
D1043 | 26/10/1962 | 81A 88A 81A 82A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Landore Laira Withdrawn |
26/10/1962 09/02/1963 28/09/1963 25/01/1964 01/06/1968 09/11/1968 04/04/1976 |
04/04/1976 |
D1044 | 12/11/1962 | 88A 83A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Newton Abbot Laira Withdrawn |
12/11/1962 12/10/1964 11/07/1965 01/02/1975 |
01/02/1975 |
D1045 | 16/11/1962 | 88A 83A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Newton Abbot Laira Withdrawn |
16/11/1962 12/10/1964 11/07/1965 16/12/1974 |
16/12/1974 |
D1046 | 24/12/1962 | 82A 88A 83A 84A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Newton Abbot Laira Withdrawn |
24/12/1962 09/02/1963 12/10/1964 11/07/1965 11/12/1975 |
11/12/1975 |
D1047 | 04/02/1963 | 88A 83A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Newton Abbot Laira Withdrawn |
04/02/1963 12/10/1964 11/07/1965 29/02/1976 |
29/02/1976 |
D1048 | 15/12/1962 | 88A 82A 88A 83A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Newton Abbot Laira Withdrawn |
15/12/1962 12/01/1963 09/02/1963 12/10/1964 11/07/1965 28/02/1977 |
28/02/1977 |
D1049 | 14/12/1962 | 88A 81A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Laira Withdrawn |
14/12/1962 09/03/1963 22/02/1964 26/04/1976 |
26/04/1976 |
D1050 | 01/01/1963 | 88A 83A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Newton Abbot Laira Withdrawn |
01/01/1963 12/10/1964 11/07/1965 06/04/1975 |
06/04/1975 |
D1051 | 21/01/1963 | 88A 81A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Old Oak Common Laira Withdrawn |
21/01/1963 28/09/1963 25/01/1964 02/09/1976 |
02/09/1976 |
D1052 | 04/02/1963 | 88A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Laira Withdrawn |
04/02/1963 07/03/1965 01/05/1966 06/10/1975 |
06/10/1975 |
D1053 | 11/02/1963 | 81A 88A 81A 82A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
11/02/1963 09/03/1963 02/11/1963 25/01/1964 14/06/1969 15/11/1976 |
15/11/1976 |
D1054 | 02/03/1963 | 88A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Laira Withdrawn |
02/03/1963 04/05/1964 01/05/1966 25/11/1976 |
25/11/1976 |
D1055 | 02/03/1963 | 88A 87E 84A 87E 82A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Laira Landore Bristol Bath Road Landore Laira Withdrawn |
02/03/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 25/01/1969 14/06/1969 04/04/1970 16/10/1971 05/01/1976 |
05/01/1976 |
D1056 | 08/03/1963 | 88A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Laira Withdrawn |
08/03/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 15/12/1976 |
15/12/1976 |
D1057 | 06/04/1963 | 83A 88A 83D 86A 87E 84A W |
Newton Abbot (New) Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Landore Laira Withdrawn |
06/04/1963 04/05/1963 01/06/1963 28/09/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 02/05/1976 |
02/05/1976 |
D1058 | 25/03/1963 | 82A 88A 87E 84A W |
Bristol Bath Road (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Laira Withdrawn |
25/03/1963 29/06/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 24/01/1977 |
24/01/1977 |
D1059 | 06/04/1963 | 88A 87E 84A 82A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
06/04/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 15/03/1969 16/10/1971 06/10/1975 |
06/10/1975 |
D1060 | 11/04/1963 | 81A 88A 87E 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
11/04/1963 01/06/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 01/11/1969 05/10/1971 18/11/1973 |
18/11/1973 |
D1061 | 19/04/1963 | 81A 88A 87E 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
19/04/1963 01/06/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 25/01/1969 05/10/1971 21/10/1974 |
21/10/1974 |
D1062 | 06/05/1963 | 81A 88A 87E 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
06/05/1963 29/06/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 09/11/1968 05/10/1971 22/08/1974 |
22/08/1974 |
D1063 | 17/05/1963 | 81A 88A 87E 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Cardiff Canton Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
17/05/1963 29/06/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 09/11/1968 05/10/1971 04/04/1976 |
04/04/1976 |
D1064 | 24/05/1963 | 88A 87E 84A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
24/05/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 01/11/1969 27/12/1969 11/12/1975 |
11/12/1975 |
D1065 | 18/06/1963 | 81A 84A 82A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
18/06/1963 25/01/1964 15/03/1969 16/10/1971 04/11/1976 |
04/11/1976 |
D1066 | 14/06/1963 | 88A 87E 84A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
14/06/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 09/11/1968 05/10/1971 12/11/1974 |
12/11/1974 |
D1067 | 18/07/1963 | 88A 87E 84A 82A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
18/07/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 15/03/1969 16/10/1971 24/01/1976 |
24/01/1976 |
D1068 | 12/07/1963 | 81A 84A 83A 82A 84A 87E 84A 87A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Laira Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Laira Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
12/07/1963 25/01/1964 13/04/1964 22/06/1964 19/09/1965 16/08/1969 29/05/1970 14/11/1970 05/10/1971 12/10/1976 |
12/10/1976 |
D1069 | 21/10/1963 | 86A 87E 84A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
21/10/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 25/01/1969 22/05/1971 06/10/1975 |
06/10/1975 |
D1070 | 28/10/1963 | 86A 87E 84A 87E 84A W |
Cardiff Canton (New) Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
28/10/1963 13/04/1964 01/05/1966 15/03/1969 22/05/1971 30/12/1976 |
30/12/1976 |
D1071 | 07/11/1963 | 81A 83A 82A 87E 84A 87E 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Landore Laira Landore Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
07/11/1963 13/04/1964 22/06/1964 01/06/1968 09/11/1968 01/11/1969 04/04/1970 29/05/1970 22/08/1970 07/12/1976 |
07/12/1976 |
D1072 | 07/11/1963 | 81A 84A 82A 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
07/11/1963 15/01/1966 14/06/1969 16/10/1971 02/11/1976 |
02/11/1976 |
D1073 | 03/12/1963 | 81A 84A 87E 84A W |
Old Oak Common (New) Laira Landore Laira Withdrawn |
03/12/1963 15/01/1966 06/12/1969 22/05/1971 29/08/1974 |
29/08/1974 |