LYR/LMS Aspinall "23" Class 0-6-0ST
Company | Old Number | Company | New Number | Subtype | Date | Information | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYR | 122 | renumbered to | LMS | 11353 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 128 | renumbered to | LMS | 11352 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 131 | renumbered to | LMS | 11368 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 132 | renumbered to | LMS | 11378 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 136 | renumbered to | LMS | 11379 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 137 | renumbered to | LMS | 11375 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 138 | renumbered to | LMS | 11381 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 140 | renumbered to | LMS | 11417 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 143 | renumbered to | LMS | 11364 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 144 | renumbered to | LMS | 11410 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 148 | renumbered to | LMS | 11408 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 149 | renumbered to | LMS | 11437 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 153 | renumbered to | LMS | 11372 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 163 | renumbered to | LMS | 11373 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 164 | renumbered to | LMS | 11371 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 165 | renumbered to | LMS | 11348 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 166 | renumbered to | LMS | 11419 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 167 | renumbered to | LMS | 11395 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 168 | renumbered to | LMS | 11341 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 170 | renumbered to | LMS | 11377 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 171 | renumbered to | LMS | 11420 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 173 | renumbered to | LMS | 11394 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 175 | renumbered to | LMS | 11425 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 176 | renumbered to | LMS | 11382 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 177 | renumbered to | LMS | 11392 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 179 | renumbered to | LMS | 11384 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 181 | renumbered to | LMS | 11376 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 182 | renumbered to | LMS | 11367 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 194 | renumbered to | LMS | 11474 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 196 | renumbered to | LMS | 11438 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 197 | renumbered to | LMS | 11405 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 204 | renumbered to | LMS | 11308 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 222 | renumbered to | LMS | 11386 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 236 | renumbered to | LMS | 11345 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 238 | renumbered to | LMS | 11363 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 242 | renumbered to | LMS | 11366 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 248 | renumbered to | LMS | 11347 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 249 | renumbered to | LMS | 11342 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 250 | renumbered to | LMS | 11360 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 254 | renumbered to | LMS | 11481 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 256 | renumbered to | LMS | 11369 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 257 | renumbered to | LMS | 11370 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 258 | renumbered to | LMS | 11355 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 266 | renumbered to | LMS | 11411 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 268 | renumbered to | LMS | 11349 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 277 | renumbered to | LMS | 11356 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 284 | renumbered to | LMS | 11415 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 292 | renumbered to | LMS | 11458 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 303 | renumbered to | LMS | 11387 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 304 | renumbered to | LMS | 11418 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 305 | renumbered to | LMS | 11511 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 306 | renumbered to | LMS | 11385 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 307 | renumbered to | LMS | 11383 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 308 | renumbered to | LMS | 11455 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 309 | renumbered to | LMS | 11406 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 311 | renumbered to | LMS | 11365 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 313 | renumbered to | LMS | 11416 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 314 | renumbered to | LMS | 11344 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 322 | renumbered to | LMS | 11444 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 324 | renumbered to | LMS | 11426 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 528 | renumbered to | LMS | 11335 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 530 | renumbered to | LMS | 11332 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 531 | renumbered to | LMS | 11316 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 532 | renumbered to | LMS | 11330 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 533 | renumbered to | LMS | 11308 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 534 | renumbered to | LMS | 11307 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 535 | renumbered to | LMS | 11318 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 536 | renumbered to | LMS | 11315 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 537 | renumbered to | LMS | 11321 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 538 | renumbered to | LMS | 11313 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 541 | renumbered to | LMS | 11328 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 542 | renumbered to | LMS | 11309 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 543 | renumbered to | LMS | 11303 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 544 | renumbered to | LMS | 11343 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 546 | renumbered to | LMS | 11350 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 547 | renumbered to | LMS | 11361 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 548 | renumbered to | LMS | 11351 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 549 | renumbered to | LMS | 11358 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 550 | renumbered to | LMS | 11326 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 551 | renumbered to | LMS | 11337 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 553 | renumbered to | LMS | 11305 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 554 | renumbered to | LMS | 11314 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 555 | renumbered to | LMS | 11336 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 556 | renumbered to | LMS | 11311 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 557 | renumbered to | LMS | 11329 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 558 | renumbered to | LMS | 11304 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 559 | renumbered to | LMS | 11325 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 560 | renumbered to | LMS | 11312 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 561 | renumbered to | LMS | 11319 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 562 | renumbered to | LMS | 11338 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 563 | renumbered to | LMS | 11323 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 564 | renumbered to | LMS | 11327 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 566 | renumbered to | LMS | 11320 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 567 | renumbered to | LMS | 11310 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 568 | renumbered to | LMS | 11521 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 569 | renumbered to | LMS | 11485 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 570 | renumbered to | LMS | 11525 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 571 | renumbered to | LMS | 11427 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 572 | renumbered to | LMS | 11459 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 573 | renumbered to | LMS | 11409 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 574 | renumbered to | LMS | 11397 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 575 | renumbered to | LMS | 11398 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 578 | renumbered to | LMS | 11471 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 579 | renumbered to | LMS | 11500 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 580 | renumbered to | LMS | 11462 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 581 | renumbered to | LMS | 11466 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 582 | renumbered to | LMS | 11431 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 583 | renumbered to | LMS | 11423 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 584 | renumbered to | LMS | 11424 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 585 | renumbered to | LMS | 11486 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 586 | renumbered to | LMS | 11497 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 587 | renumbered to | LMS | 11472 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 588 | renumbered to | LMS | 11445 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 589 | renumbered to | LMS | 11460 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 590 | renumbered to | LMS | 11508 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 591 | renumbered to | LMS | 11442 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 592 | renumbered to | LMS | 11470 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 593 | renumbered to | LMS | 11509 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 594 | renumbered to | LMS | 11452 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 595 | renumbered to | LMS | 11530 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 596 | renumbered to | LMS | 11446 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 597 | renumbered to | LMS | 11432 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 598 | renumbered to | LMS | 11412 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 599 | renumbered to | LMS | 11421 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 600 | renumbered to | LMS | 11473 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 621 | renumbered to | LMS | 11440 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 663 | renumbered to | LMS | 11489 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 747 | renumbered to | LMS | 11413 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 748 | renumbered to | LMS | 11447 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 749 | renumbered to | LMS | 11430 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 750 | renumbered to | LMS | 11520 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 751 | renumbered to | LMS | 11513 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 752 | renumbered to | LMS | 11456 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 753 | renumbered to | LMS | 11435 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 754 | renumbered to | LMS | 11433 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 755 | renumbered to | LMS | 11399 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 756 | renumbered to | LMS | 11468 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 757 | renumbered to | LMS | 11493 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 758 | renumbered to | LMS | 11454 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 759 | renumbered to | LMS | 11403 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 760 | renumbered to | LMS | 11495 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 761 | renumbered to | LMS | 11526 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 762 | renumbered to | LMS | 11396 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 763 | renumbered to | LMS | 11464 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 764 | renumbered to | LMS | 11499 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 765 | renumbered to | LMS | 11469 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 766 | renumbered to | LMS | 11449 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 767 | renumbered to | LMS | 11436 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 768 | renumbered to | LMS | 11401 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 769 | renumbered to | LMS | 11422 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 771 | renumbered to | LMS | 11483 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 772 | renumbered to | LMS | 11492 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 773 | renumbered to | LMS | 11443 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 774 | renumbered to | LMS | 11467 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 775 | renumbered to | LMS | 11391 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 776 | renumbered to | LMS | 11388 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 777 | renumbered to | LMS | 11465 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 778 | renumbered to | LMS | 11429 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 779 | renumbered to | LMS | 11450 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 780 | renumbered to | LMS | 11407 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 781 | renumbered to | LMS | 11512 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 782 | renumbered to | LMS | 11457 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 783 | renumbered to | LMS | 11390 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 784 | renumbered to | LMS | 11451 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 785 | renumbered to | LMS | 11393 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 786 | renumbered to | LMS | 11507 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 787 | renumbered to | LMS | 11503 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 788 | renumbered to | LMS | 11484 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 793 | renumbered to | LMS | 11439 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 794 | renumbered to | LMS | 11531 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 795 | renumbered to | LMS | 11434 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 796 | renumbered to | LMS | 11517 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 797 | renumbered to | LMS | 11487 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 798 | renumbered to | LMS | 11441 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 799 | renumbered to | LMS | 11404 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 800 | renumbered to | LMS | 11527 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 801 | renumbered to | LMS | 11453 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 802 | renumbered to | LMS | 11524 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 803 | renumbered to | LMS | 11475 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 804 | renumbered to | LMS | 11463 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 805 | renumbered to | LMS | 11532 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 806 | renumbered to | LMS | 11528 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 807 | renumbered to | LMS | 11400 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 808 | renumbered to | LMS | 11448 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 809 | renumbered to | LMS | 11514 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 810 | renumbered to | LMS | 11510 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 811 | renumbered to | LMS | 11461 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 812 | renumbered to | LMS | 11490 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 843 | renumbered to | LMS | 11482 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 844 | renumbered to | LMS | 11519 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 845 | renumbered to | LMS | 11488 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 846 | renumbered to | LMS | 11496 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 847 | renumbered to | LMS | 11477 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 848 | renumbered to | LMS | 11506 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 849 | renumbered to | LMS | 11529 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 850 | renumbered to | LMS | 11522 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 851 | renumbered to | LMS | 11498 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 852 | renumbered to | LMS | 11491 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 853 | renumbered to | LMS | 11476 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 854 | renumbered to | LMS | 11502 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 855 | renumbered to | LMS | 11479 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 856 | renumbered to | LMS | 11523 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 857 | renumbered to | LMS | 11480 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 858 | renumbered to | LMS | 11494 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 859 | renumbered to | LMS | 11504 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 860 | renumbered to | LMS | 11516 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 861 | renumbered to | LMS | 11515 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LYR | 862 | renumbered to | LMS | 11505 | 1924 | 1924 | ||
LMS | 11524 | renumbered to | BR | 51524 | 04/1948 | |||
LMS | 11313 | renumbered to | BR | 51313 | 01/05/1948 | |||
LMS | 11425 | renumbered to | BR | 51425 | 01/05/1948 | |||
LMS | 11410 | renumbered to | BR | 51410 | 15/05/1948 | |||
LMS | 11474 | renumbered to | BR | 51474 | 15/05/1948 | |||
LMS | 11462 | renumbered to | BR | 51462 | 28/05/1948 | |||
LMS | 11499 | renumbered to | BR | 51499 | 28/05/1948 | |||
LMS | 11500 | renumbered to | BR | 51500 | 28/05/1948 | |||
LMS | 11423 | renumbered to | BR | 51423 | 05/06/1948 | |||
LMS | 11343 | renumbered to | BR | 51343 | 03/07/1948 | |||
LMS | 11477 | renumbered to | BR | 51477 | 03/07/1948 | |||
LMS | 11361 | renumbered to | BR | 51361 | 10/07/1948 | |||
LMS | 11512 | renumbered to | BR | 51512 | 10/07/1948 | |||
LMS | 11323 | renumbered to | BR | 51323 | 31/07/1948 | |||
LMS | 11321 | renumbered to | BR | 51321 | 07/08/1948 | |||
LMS | 11447 | renumbered to | BR | 51447 | 04/09/1948 | |||
LMS | 11526 | renumbered to | BR | 51526 | 04/09/1948 | |||
LMS | 11413 | renumbered to | BR | 51413 | 18/09/1948 | |||
LMS | 11446 | renumbered to | BR | 51446 | 25/09/1948 | |||
LMS | 11307 | renumbered to | BR | 51307 | 02/10/1948 | |||
LMS | 11348 | renumbered to | BR | 51348 | 09/10/1948 | |||
LMS | 11412 | renumbered to | BR | 51412 | 09/10/1948 | |||
LMS | 11436 | renumbered to | BR | 51436 | 23/10/1948 | |||
LMS | 11404 | renumbered to | BR | 51404 | 11/1948 | |||
LMS | 11488 | renumbered to | BR | 51488 | 11/1948 | |||
LMS | 11504 | renumbered to | BR | 51504 | 06/11/1948 | |||
LMS | 11457 | renumbered to | BR | 51457 | 12/1948 | |||
LMS | 11479 | renumbered to | BR | 51479 | 01/1949 | |||
LMS | 11513 | renumbered to | BR | 51513 | 01/1949 | |||
LMS | 11319 | renumbered to | BR | 51319 | 02/1949 | |||
LMS | 11429 | renumbered to | BR | 51429 | 02/1949 | |||
LMS | 11489 | renumbered to | BR | 51489 | 02/1949 | |||
LMS | 11497 | renumbered to | BR | 51497 | 02/1949 | |||
LMS | 11408 | renumbered to | BR | 51408 | 03/1949 | |||
LMS | 11432 | renumbered to | BR | 51432 | 03/1949 | |||
LMS | 11379 | renumbered to | BR | 51379 | 04/1949 | |||
LMS | 11460 | renumbered to | BR | 51460 | 05/1949 | |||
LMS | 11464 | renumbered to | BR | 51464 | 05/1949 | |||
LMS | 11503 | renumbered to | BR | 51503 | 05/1949 | |||
LMS | 11471 | renumbered to | BR | 51471 | 06/1949 | |||
LMS | 11481 | renumbered to | BR | 51481 | 07/1949 | |||
LMS | 11506 | renumbered to | BR | 51506 | 07/1949 | |||
LMS | 11439 | renumbered to | BR | 51439 | 08/1949 | |||
LMS | 11316 | renumbered to | BR | 51316 | 09/1949 | |||
LMS | 11336 | renumbered to | BR | 51336 | 09/1949 | |||
LMS | 11345 | renumbered to | BR | 51345 | 09/1949 | |||
LMS | 11510 | renumbered to | BR | 51510 | 09/1949 | |||
LMS | 11415 | renumbered to | BR | 51415 | 10/1949 | |||
LMS | 11453 | renumbered to | BR | 51453 | 10/1949 | |||
LMS | 11521 | renumbered to | BR | 51521 | 10/1949 | |||
LMS | 11419 | renumbered to | BR | 51419 | 12/11/1949 | |||
LMS | 11358 | renumbered to | BR | 51358 | 26/11/1949 | |||
LMS | 11441 | renumbered to | BR | 51441 | 12/1949 | |||
LMS | 11397 | renumbered to | BR | 51397 | 24/12/1949 | |||
LMS | 11424 | renumbered to | BR | 51424 | 31/12/1949 | |||
LMS | 11444 | renumbered to | BR | 51444 | 01/1950 | |||
LMS | 11530 | renumbered to | BR | 51530 | 01/1950 | |||
LMS | 11445 | renumbered to | BR | 51445 | 03/1950 | |||
LMS | 11491 | renumbered to | BR | 51491 | 03/1950 | |||
LMS | 11381 | renumbered to | BR | 51381 | 04/1950 | |||
LMS | 11390 | renumbered to | BR | 51390 | 04/1950 | |||
LMS | 11458 | renumbered to | BR | 51458 | 04/1950 | |||
LMS | 11472 | renumbered to | BR | 51472 | 04/1950 | |||
LMS | 11396 | renumbered to | BR | 51396 | 05/1950 | |||
LMS | 11353 | renumbered to | BR | 51353 | 06/1950 | |||
LMS | 11376 | renumbered to | BR | 51376 | 06/1950 | |||
LMS | 11484 | renumbered to | BR | 51484 | 07/1950 | |||
LMS | 11516 | renumbered to | BR | 51516 | 07/1950 | |||
LMS | 11514 | renumbered to | BR | 51514 | 08/1950 | |||
LMS | 11470 | renumbered to | BR | 51470 | 09/1950 | |||
LMS | 11490 | renumbered to | BR | 51490 | 09/1950 | |||
LMS | 11496 | renumbered to | BR | 51496 | 09/1950 | |||
LMS | 11498 | renumbered to | BR | 51498 | 09/1950 | |||
LMS | 11511 | renumbered to | BR | 51511 | 09/1950 | |||
LMS | 11338 | renumbered to | BR | 51338 | 10/1950 | |||
LMS | 11375 | renumbered to | BR | 51375 | 10/1950 | |||
LMS | 11519 | renumbered to | BR | 51519 | 10/1950 | |||
LMS | 11371 | renumbered to | BR | 51371 | 11/1950 | |||
LMS | 11486 | renumbered to | BR | 51486 | 12/1950 |