Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1052 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18855 Week
» 71871 Month
» 191398 Year
» 3218251 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
583 |
|
03/1881 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11423 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51423 |
|
05/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
886 |
To Service |
During 03/1881 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1958 |
Service Life |
77 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
EXLOAN |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
02/11/1946 |
LOAN |
28B |
Fleetwood |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1916 |
Reboilered |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1946 |
New LMS Districts |
New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1881 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 583 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 886 |
|
|
10/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11423 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51423 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B) |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51423 |
|
|