Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 2252 Today
» 4203 Yesterday
» 23671 Week
» 46642 Month
» 393066 Year
» 3419919 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
534 |
|
03/1877 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11307 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51307 |
|
02/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
Works Number |
2115 |
To Service |
During 03/1877 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/11/1957 |
Service Life |
80 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
23A |
Bank Hall |
w/e |
30/11/1946 |
LOAN |
27B |
Aintree |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
27A |
Bank Hall |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/11/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1898 |
Reboilered |
01/1917 |
Reboilered |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1877 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 534 Built at Kitson, Works Number 2115 |
|
|
09/1898 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
01/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11307 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51307 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
23/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51307 |
|
|