Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1600 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15006 Week
» 68022 Month
» 187549 Year
» 3214402 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
165 |
|
10/1878 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11348 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51348 |
|
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
Works Number |
2239 |
To Service |
During 10/1878 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/09/1953 |
Service Life |
74 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24F |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
ALLOC |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/09/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1899 |
Reboilered |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1878 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 165 Built at Kitson, Works Number 2239 |
|
|
02/1899 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11348 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51348 |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51348 |
|
|