LSWR/SR Urie "H15" Class 4-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1935 | Reallocation | 331 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 477 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 330 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 331 | SAL | Salisbury | SAL | Salisbury | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 332 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 333 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 334 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 335 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 473 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 474 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 475 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 476 | SAL | Salisbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 477 | ELH | Eastleigh | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 478 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 482 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 483 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 484 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 485 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 486 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 487 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 488 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 489 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 490 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 491 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 521 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 522 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 523 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 524 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/06/1948 | Reallocation | 477 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | ELH | Eastleigh | |
08/01/1949 | Reallocation | 30476 | SAL | Salisbury | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30330 | SAL | Salisbury | SAL | Salisbury | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30334 | SAL | Salisbury | SAL | Salisbury | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30335 | SAL | Salisbury | SAL | Salisbury | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30475 | SAL | Salisbury | SAL | Salisbury | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30477 | ELH | Eastleigh | ELH | Eastleigh | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30478 | ELH | Eastleigh | ELH | Eastleigh | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 30484 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 30331 | SAL | Salisbury | FEL | Feltham | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 30334 | SAL | Salisbury | FEL | Feltham | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 30335 | SAL | Salisbury | FEL | Feltham | |
10/06/1950 | Reallocation | 30334 | FEL | Feltham | 70A | Nine Elms | |
10/06/1950 | Reallocation | 30335 | FEL | Feltham | 70A | Nine Elms | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 30334 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 30335 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 30330 | SAL | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 30331 | FEL | Feltham | 72B | Salisbury | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 30330 | 72B | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 30331 | 72B | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
13/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30332 | SAL | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
13/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30333 | SAL | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
13/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30334 | 70A | Nine Elms | 72B | Salisbury | |
13/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30335 | 70A | Nine Elms | 72B | Salisbury | |
13/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30476 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | 71A | Eastleigh | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30332 | 72B | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30333 | 72B | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30334 | 72B | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30335 | 72B | Salisbury | 72B | Salisbury | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30476 | 71A | Eastleigh | 71A | Eastleigh | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 30521 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 30483 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 30489 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 30491 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 30521 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70A | Nine Elms | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 30522 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 30523 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
05/02/1951 | Reallocation | 30524 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
09/04/1955 | Condemned | 30485 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
21/06/1955 | Reallocation | 30478 | ELH | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
07/1955 | Condemned | 30490 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
03/11/1956 | Condemned | 30332 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
11/05/1957 | Condemned | 30330 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
22/06/1957 | Condemned | 30483 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
11/1957 | Condemned | 30487 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
06/1958 | Condemned | 30334 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
25/10/1958 | Condemned | 30333 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
04/1959 | Condemned | 30478 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
18/04/1959 | Condemned | 30488 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
09/05/1959 | Condemned | 30482 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
09/05/1959 | Condemned | 30484 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
06/06/1959 | Condemned | 30335 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 30522 | 70A | Nine Elms | 72B | Salisbury | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 30523 | 70A | Nine Elms | 72B | Salisbury | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 30524 | 70A | Nine Elms | 72B | Salisbury | |
07/1959 | Condemned | 30473 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
04/07/1959 | Condemned | 30477 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
11/07/1959 | Condemned | 30486 | NINEELMS | Nine Elms | COND | ||
30/04/1960 | Condemned | 30474 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
01/1961 | Condemned | 30491 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
28/01/1961 | Condemned | 30489 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
25/02/1961 | Condemned | 30524 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
18/03/1961 | Condemned | 30331 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
10/1961 | Condemned | 30522 | 72B | Salisbury | COND | ||
09/12/1961 | Condemned | 30475 | SAL | Salisbury | COND | ||
09/12/1961 | Condemned | 30476 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
09/12/1961 | Condemned | 30521 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
09/12/1961 | Condemned | 30523 | 72B | Salisbury | COND |