Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1111 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14517 Week
» 67533 Month
» 187060 Year
» 3213913 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
332 |
m/e |
10/1905 |
British Railways |
30332 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie |
Class |
H15 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 10/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/11/1956 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1905 |
SAL |
|
Salisbury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
72B |
|
Salisbury |
4w/e |
13/11/1950 |
72B |
|
Salisbury |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
03/11/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
REINS |
72B |
Salisbury |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
REINS |
72B |
Salisbury |
6w/e |
22/06/1954 |
TOSTORE |
72B |
Salisbury |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
REINS |
72B |
Salisbury |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/11/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Southampton Docks |
Some of the U.S.A. 0-6-0 tanks, by Vulcan Iron Works, are already at work in Southern livery: 70 (ex-1960) and 72 (ex-1973) appeared in April, and 62 (ex-1277), 67 (ex-1282) and 66 (ex-1279) in May. Nos. 1959, 1971, and 1974 will soon be out as 64, 68 and 73 respectively. Other engines noted on the Docks in May were: 176 Guernsey, 97 Brittany, 98 Cherbourg, 96 Normandy, 102 Granville, 147 Dinard (all Class 'B.4') and a 0-4-0 saddle tank (name removed) MDE 177 (Barclay 1188/1910) derelict. Also two Stroudley 'E.1' tanks, one of which was 689. 89 Trouville was at Brighton, 82, 87 and 3744 at Eastleigh. A large number of withdrawn locos. still stand at Eastleigh, including W10, 3334 and L.B.S.C.R. 683 now showing the Marsh livery and lining, the S. & M. markings having disappeared; (this last was No. 9 Daphne on the S. & M.R.): also what must be the last L.S.W. duplicate number, 332 with underline. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 332 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30332 |
|
|
13/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30332 |
|
|
03/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|