Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2021 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19824 Week
» 72840 Month
» 192367 Year
» 3219220 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
478 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
British Railways |
30478 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie |
Class |
H15 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 06/1924 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1959 |
Service Life |
34 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1924 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
70A |
|
Nine Elms |
6w/e |
21/06/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
04/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
m/e |
30/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
04/06/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 478 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30478 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30478 |
|
|
04/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|