Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1161 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14567 Week
» 67583 Month
» 187110 Year
» 3213963 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
333 |
m/e |
10/1905 |
British Railways |
30333 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie |
Class |
H15 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 10/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/10/1958 |
Service Life |
53 yrs , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1905 |
SAL |
|
Salisbury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
72B |
|
Salisbury |
4w/e |
13/11/1950 |
72B |
|
Salisbury |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
25/10/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 333 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30333 |
|
|
13/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30333 |
|
|
11/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|