Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3187 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30366 Week
» 21422 Month
» 367846 Year
» 3394699 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6674
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5091 |
CLEEVE ABBEY |
18/12/1938 |
Castle |
5088 |
LLANTHONY ABBEY |
24/09/1943 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
19/06/1945 |
Castle |
5083 |
BATH ABBEY |
06/12/1946 |
Castle |
4077 |
CHEPSTOW CASTLE |
28/03/1950 |
Castle |
5091 |
CLEEVE ABBEY |
20/06/1952 |
Castle |
5014 |
GOODRICH CASTLE |
04/06/1954 |
Castle |
5076 |
GLADIATOR |
05/04/1956 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
30/07/1959 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
18/10/1961 |
|