|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 26/01/1925 | 21/02/1925 | 27 days | Heavy | 66364 | ||
Swindon Works | 01/02/1926 | 22/05/1926 | 111 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4659 (Diagram HA) |
120882 | |
Swindon Works | 08/09/1926 | 14/10/1926 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 24/08/1927 | 08/10/1927 | 46 days | Light Repair | Tender number 1513 (Dean 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/06/1928 | 22/09/1928 | 90 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 16/01/1929 | 04/02/1929 | 20 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2413 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 03/06/1929 | 29/08/1929 | 88 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
276295 | |
Swindon Works | 15/01/1931 | 10/03/1931 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 4654 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2414 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
365624 | |
Swindon Works | 28/09/1932 | 30/11/1932 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA) |
460946 | |
Swindon Works | 06/01/1933 | 20/01/1933 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 30/05/1933 | 07/1933 | Light Repair | ||||
Swindon Works | 27/03/1934 | 20/05/1934 | 55 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2574 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
543113 | |
Swindon Works | 27/03/1935 | 30/08/1935 | 157 days | General | Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA) Tender number 1561 (Dean 4,000g) attached. |
600348 | |
Swindon Works | 08/05/1936 | 19/05/1936 | 12 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 01/12/1936 | 02/02/1937 | 64 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
684546 | |
Swindon Works | 01/11/1937 | 07/12/1937 | 37 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2246 (Collett 3,500g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 28/06/1938 | 28/08/1938 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 4633 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2662 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
762542 | |
Swindon Works | 23/12/1938 | 23/01/1939 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 30/04/1940 | 17/06/1940 | 49 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2594 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
850257 | |
Swindon Works | 10/05/1942 | 24/07/1942 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
923539 | |
Swindon Works | 28/03/1944 | 20/05/1944 | 54 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2616 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1002258 | |
Swindon Works | 10/04/1946 | 21/05/1946 | 42 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6635 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2893 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1078129 | |
Swindon Works | 04/06/1947 | 07/08/1947 | 65 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2859 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 30/01/1948 | 12/03/1948 | 43 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2756 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1150447 | |
Swindon Works | 20/01/1950 | 28/02/1950 | 40 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2847 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1222659 | |
Swindon Works | 22/01/1951 | 28/02/1951 | 38 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 18/06/1951 | 08/08/1951 | 52 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4011 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 28/11/1951 | 28/01/1952 | 62 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4001 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1290712 | |
Swindon Works | 18/05/1953 | 29/07/1953 | 73 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1346547 | |
Swindon Works | 15/09/1954 | 27/10/1954 | 43 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6633 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1402815 | |
Swindon Works | 12/10/1956 | 04/02/1957 | 116 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4114 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1480795 | |
Swindon Works | 12/03/1957 | 03/04/1957 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 31/03/1959 | 30/07/1959 | 122 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4066 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1555862 | |
Swindon Works | 29/09/1959 | 23/10/1959 | 25 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 05/06/1961 | 15/08/1961 | 72 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2780 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1631858 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1924 | Tender | Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2225 | ||
07/02/1924 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4076, name: CARMARTHEN CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
26/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/01/1925. Dep: 21/02/1925. | ||
01/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/02/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4659 (Diagram HA) |
||
08/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1926. Dep: 14/10/1926. | ||
24/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927. Work undertaken: Tender number 1513 (Dean 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1928. Dep: 22/09/1928. | ||
16/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/01/1929. Dep: 04/02/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 2413 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/06/1929. Dep: 29/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/12/1930 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2418 | ||
15/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1931. Dep: 10/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4654 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2414 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1932. Dep: 30/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA) |
||
30/11/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
04/01/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
06/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/01/1933. Dep: 20/01/1933. | ||
20/01/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
30/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1933. Dep: ?/07/1933. | ||
27/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/03/1934. Dep: 20/05/1934. Work undertaken: Tender number 2574 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM) | ||
11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
27/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1935. Dep: 30/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA) Tender number 1561 (Dean 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exeter (EXE) | ||
08/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1936. Dep: 19/05/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/12/1936. Dep: 02/02/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1937. Dep: 07/12/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2246 (Collett 3,500g) attached. |
||
28/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1938. Dep: 28/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4633 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2662 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
23/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/12/1938. Dep: 23/01/1939. | ||
30/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/04/1940. Dep: 17/06/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2594 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) | ||
10/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1942. Dep: 24/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
28/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/03/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2616 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/04/1946. Dep: 21/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6635 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2893 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1947. Dep: 07/08/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 2859 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
30/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/01/1948. Dep: 12/03/1948. Work undertaken: Tender number 2756 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (CHR) | ||
04/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (CHR) | ||
20/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 20/01/1950. Dep: 28/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2847 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/01/1951. Dep: 28/02/1951. Work undertaken: Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/06/1951. Dep: 08/08/1951. Work undertaken: Tender number 4011 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1951. Dep: 28/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4001 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/05/1953. Dep: 29/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/09/1954. Dep: 27/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6633 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) | ||
01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
12/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1956. Dep: 04/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4114 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/03/1957. Dep: 03/04/1957. | ||
30/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
31/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/03/1959. Dep: 30/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4066 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/09/1959. Dep: 23/10/1959. Work undertaken: Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/06/1961. Dep: 15/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2780 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
28/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
16/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
08/02/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4076 from Llanelli (87F) |