|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 22/05/1939 | 01/06/1939 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 14/01/1942 | 08/03/1942 | 54 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2593 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
113790 | |
Swindon Works | 13/08/1943 | 01/10/1943 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2871 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
186710 | |
Swindon Works | 15/08/1944 | 29/09/1944 | 46 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2552 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 07/02/1945 | 19/03/1945 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 6628 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2764 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
253581 | |
Swindon Works | 27/08/1947 | 06/10/1947 | 41 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6632 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2805 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
357551 | |
Swindon Works | 28/01/1949 | 02/03/1949 | 34 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2407 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
429991 | |
Swindon Works | 21/06/1950 | 03/08/1950 | 44 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2790 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 21/06/1951 | 16/08/1951 | 57 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2403 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
524804 | |
Swindon Works | 06/12/1951 | 29/01/1952 | 55 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 16/01/1953 | 02/03/1953 | 46 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
604802 | |
Swindon Works | 01/09/1954 | 19/10/1954 | 49 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4048 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
696416 | |
Swindon Works | 12/05/1956 | 21/06/1956 | 41 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6678 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2852 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
780625 | |
Swindon Works | 11/03/1958 | 1 day | Heavy General | ||||
Swindon Works | 03/05/1960 | 27/06/1960 | 56 days | Light Intermediate | Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
961759 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). | SLS/194710 |
31/07/1962 | Withdrawn GWR engines | It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4068, name: LLANTHONY ABBEY Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2922 |
||
02/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2776 | ||
07/03/1939 | Modification | Diagram HB number 6675 boiler fitted | ||
07/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (SALOP) | ||
07/03/1939 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5088 | ||
22/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1939. Dep: 01/06/1939. | ||
14/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 14/01/1942. Dep: 08/03/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2593 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/03/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
13/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1943. Dep: 01/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2871 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/08/1944. Dep: 29/09/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2552 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1945. Dep: 19/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6628 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2764 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
27/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/08/1947. Dep: 06/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6632 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2805 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/01/1949. Dep: 02/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2407 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/06/1950. Dep: 03/08/1950. Work undertaken: Tender number 2790 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/06/1951. Dep: 16/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2403 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1951. Dep: 29/01/1952. | ||
16/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/01/1953. Dep: 02/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/06/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4068 | ||
01/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/09/1954. Dep: 19/10/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 4048 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/05/1956. Dep: 21/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6678 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2852 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/03/1958. | ||
10/06/1958 | Modification | Diagram HD number 7652 boiler fitted | ||
10/06/1958 | Modification | Modification: Double Chimney fitted | ||
10/06/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2717 | ||
03/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/05/1960. Dep: 27/06/1960. Work undertaken: Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) | ||
02/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5088 from Stafford Road (84A) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |