|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 25/06/1924 | 03/07/1924 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 26/02/1925 | 28/03/1925 | 31 days | Heavy | 66105 | ||
Swindon Works | 08/01/1926 | 30/03/1926 | 82 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA) |
118707 | |
Swindon Works | 31/08/1926 | 21/10/1926 | 52 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 13/11/1926 | 11/12/1926 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 04/02/1927 | 12/02/1927 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 30/04/1927 | 28/05/1927 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 10/06/1927 | 30/07/1927 | 51 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 09/05/1928 | 11/08/1928 | 95 days | Light Repair | Tender number 1515 (Dean 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 14/09/1928 | 01/10/1928 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 03/05/1929 | 13/05/1929 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 08/08/1929 | 08/10/1929 | 62 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA) |
281334 | |
Swindon Works | 24/09/1930 | 21/11/1930 | 59 days | Heavy | Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
371134 | |
Swindon Works | 14/01/1931 | 07/02/1931 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 11/05/1932 | 10/07/1932 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA) |
457701 | |
Swindon Works | 08/01/1935 | 14/03/1935 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA) |
611306 | |
Swindon Works | 20/05/1936 | 09/07/1936 | 51 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2564 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
686506 | |
Swindon Works | 13/01/1938 | 05/03/1938 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2578 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
763836 | |
Swindon Works | 28/06/1939 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Swindon Works | 22/11/1939 | 14/01/1940 | 54 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2622 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
848022 | |
Swindon Works | 30/09/1941 | 30/11/1941 | 62 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2785 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
938074 | |
Swindon Works | 06/01/1942 | 03/02/1942 | 29 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2805 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/07/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 6650 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2593 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1002067 | |
Swindon Works | 11/08/1945 | 20/09/1945 | 41 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2661 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1089674 | |
Swindon Works | 19/06/1946 | 30/07/1946 | 42 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2400 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/03/1948 | 22/04/1948 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2813 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1156959 | |
Swindon Works | 20/02/1950 | 28/03/1950 | 37 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4058 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1234629 | |
Swindon Works | 04/06/1951 | 06/07/1951 | 33 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 04/04/1952 | 16/05/1952 | 43 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6661 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4015 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1325259 | |
Swindon Works | 28/11/1952 | 02/01/1953 | 36 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2729 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 14/11/1953 | 15/01/1954 | 63 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2770 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1393412 | |
Swindon Works | 14/05/1955 | 28/06/1955 | 46 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6668 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4117 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1475597 | |
Swindon Works | 24/11/1956 | 19/03/1957 | 116 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2696 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1564461 | |
Swindon Works | 10/11/1958 | 08/01/1959 | 60 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4077 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1667217 | |
Swindon Works | 12/09/1960 | 10/11/1960 | 60 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6678 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2701 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1750268 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. | SLS/194805 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1924 | Tender | Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2217 | ||
10/02/1924 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4077, name: CHEPSTOW CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
25/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1924. Dep: 03/07/1924. | ||
26/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/02/1925. Dep: 28/03/1925. | ||
05/1925 | Tender | Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2227 | ||
08/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/01/1926. Dep: 30/03/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA) |
||
31/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1926. Dep: 21/10/1926. | ||
13/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/11/1926. Dep: 11/12/1926. | ||
04/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/02/1927. Dep: 12/02/1927. | ||
30/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 28/05/1927. | ||
10/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/06/1927. Dep: 30/07/1927. | ||
09/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1928. Dep: 11/08/1928. Work undertaken: Tender number 1515 (Dean 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/09/1928. Dep: 01/10/1928. | ||
30/04/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 3,500g Intermediate number 2385 | ||
03/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/05/1929. Dep: 13/05/1929. | ||
08/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/08/1929. Dep: 08/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA) |
||
08/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
24/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/09/1930. Dep: 21/11/1930. Work undertaken: Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1931. Dep: 07/02/1931. | ||
11/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1932. Dep: 10/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA) |
||
10/07/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM) | ||
10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
07/04/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2424 | ||
08/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1935. Dep: 14/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA) |
||
14/03/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
20/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1936. Dep: 09/07/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 2564 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2578 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exeter (EXE) | ||
01/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (PZ) | ||
28/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1939. | ||
31/07/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2536 | ||
22/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/11/1939. Dep: 14/01/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2622 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (PZ) | ||
30/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1941. Dep: 30/11/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2785 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
06/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/01/1942. Dep: 03/02/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2805 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6650 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2593 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 20/09/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2661 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1946. Dep: 30/07/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 2400 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
25/01/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2902 | ||
14/06/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2569 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
12/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1948. Dep: 22/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2813 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 20/02/1950. Dep: 28/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4058 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1951. Dep: 06/07/1951. Work undertaken: Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/04/1952. Dep: 16/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6661 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4015 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1952. Dep: 02/01/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2729 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/11/1953. Dep: 15/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2770 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
14/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/05/1955. Dep: 28/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6668 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4117 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/11/1956. Dep: 19/03/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 2696 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/11/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2869 | ||
10/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 08/01/1959. Work undertaken: Tender number 4077 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) | ||
10/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
12/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/09/1960. Dep: 10/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6678 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2701 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) | ||
30/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
02/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4077 from St Philips Marsh (82B) |