Depot: Crewe Electric
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Electric | AL1 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/01/1974 | E3008 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/01/1974 | E3080 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/01/1974 | E3082 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | E3087 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | E3091 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Electric | AL1 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 81015 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 85002 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 85003 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 85013 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL1 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/03/1975 | 81007 | Transfer out to: | GW | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL1 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/03/1975 | 81015 | Transfer out to: | GW | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 84001 | Transfer in from: | LMW | London Midland - Western Lines | ||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 84002 | Transfer in from: | LMW | London Midland - Western Lines | ||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 84003 | Transfer in from: | LMW | London Midland - Western Lines | ||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 84004 | Transfer in from: | LMW | London Midland - Western Lines | ||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 84005 | Transfer in from: | LG | Longsight (Electric) | ||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 84006 | Transfer in from: | LG | Longsight (Electric) | ||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 84007 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 84008 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 84009 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 84010 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/04/1977 | 84005 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/04/1977 | 84007 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/11/1977 | 84004 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/01/1978 | 84006 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/08/1978 | 84009 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/01/1979 | 84001 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/10/1979 | 84008 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/09/1980 | 84002 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/11/1980 | 84003 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL4 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/11/1980 | 84010 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | on | 29/05/1983 | 85027 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/05/1989 | 85002 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/01/1990 | 85025 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/10/1990 | 85013 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/07/1991 | 85108 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/10/1991 | 85110 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL5 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/11/1991 | 85113 | Condemned |