Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 168 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17971 Week
» 70987 Month
» 190514 Year
» 3217367 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3039 |
08/07/1960 |
TOPS (Tops) |
84004 |
10/06/1972 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
08/07/1960 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
06/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3039 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27796 |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Midland - Western Lines (LMW) |
|
|
06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 84004 |
|
|
12/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Electric (CE) |
|
|
12/11/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84004 |
|
|
01/03/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|