Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 833 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18636 Week
» 71652 Month
» 191179 Year
» 3218032 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3036 |
08/03/1960 |
TOPS (Tops) |
84001 |
22/12/1972 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
08/03/1960 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
12/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3036 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27793 |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Midland - Western Lines (LMW) |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/12/1972 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 84001 |
|
|
12/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Electric (CE) |
|
|
01/01/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84001 from Crewe Electric (CE) |
|
|