Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 621 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31271 Week
» 129916 Month
» 332580 Year
» 3359433 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5839 |
03/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31306 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
03/05/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5839 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
07/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31306 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
11/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Old Oak Common MPD |
|
|