Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 845 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18648 Week
» 71664 Month
» 191191 Year
» 3218044 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Wath
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Wath |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 36b | 01/04/1952 | 30/06/1958 | 41f | 01/07/1958 | 03/11/1963 | 41C | 04/11/1963 | 05/05/1973 | WH | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Closed |
01/1983 |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 01/04/1952 | Change of code to 36b | 01/07/1958 | Change of code to 41f | 04/11/1963 | Change of code to 41C | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to WH | 01/1983 | Depot closed |
|
|
|