Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1000 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6976 Week
» 13110 Month
» 240994 Year
» 1462559 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Saltley


Depot Details
Depot Name Saltley
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
3187531/12/1922
M301/01/192331/01/1935
21A01/02/193531/08/1963
2E01/09/196305/05/1973
SY06/05/1973
Date Opened 1868
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line south of the station. The yard is partially visible from the line.

From Saltley Station.
Turn left outside the station, and first right into Crawford Street. Turn right at the end into Adderley Street, and right again into Duddeston Mill Road. The shed entrance is on the left hand side just before the railway over-bridge. Walking time 10 minutes.

From Vauxhall and Duddeston Station.
Turn right outside the station into Duddeston Mill Road. Go under the railway bridge, and the shed entrance is on the right hand side. Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1868Depot opened
1875Change of code to 3
01/01/1923Change of code to M3
01/01/1935Change of code to 21A
01/09/1963Change of code to 2E
06/03/1967Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to SY