LNER Peppercorn "A2" Class 4-6-2
Class | LNER (1946) | BR (Pfx) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
A2 | 525 | 60525 | 24/12/1947 | DON NWE NWE 61B ABD W |
Doncaster New England New England Aberdeen Ferryhill Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
24/12/1947 12/12/1948 18/12/1948 28/08/1949 03/09/1949 27/03/1963 |
27/03/1963 | |
A2 | 526 | 60526 | 09/01/1948 | YK NEV NEV YK YK W |
York (North) Neville Hill Neville Hill York (North) York (North) Withdrawn |
09/01/1948 18/01/1948 24/01/1948 26/09/1948 02/10/1948 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | |
A2 | 527 | 60527 | 30/01/1948 | GHD DEE DEE 63A 61B 66A W |
Gateshead Dundee Tay Bridge Dundee Tay Bridge Perth South Aberdeen Ferryhill Polmadie Withdrawn |
30/01/1948 26/06/1949 02/07/1949 04/04/1960 28/05/1960 15/09/1963 24/04/1965 |
24/04/1965 | |
A2 | 528 | 60528 | 21/02/1948 | GHD DEE DEE 63A 61B 62B 61B W |
Gateshead Dundee Tay Bridge Dundee Tay Bridge Perth South Aberdeen Ferryhill Dundee Tay Bridge Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
21/02/1948 26/06/1949 02/07/1949 02/05/1960 28/05/1960 19/06/1961 24/04/1966 02/06/1966 |
02/06/1966 | |
A2 | 529 | 60529 | 21/02/1948 | HAY 64A W |
Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
21/02/1948 16/10/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
A2 | 530 | 60530 | 04/03/1948 | KX NWE NWE 64B 64A 66A 62B W |
Kings Cross New England New England Haymarket St Margarets Polmadie Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
04/03/1948 12/12/1948 25/12/1948 09/01/1950 16/10/1961 15/09/1963 31/07/1964 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | |
A2 | 531 | 60531 | 12/03/1948 | GHD 61B ABD 50A W |
Gateshead Aberdeen Ferryhill Aberdeen Ferryhill York (North) Withdrawn |
12/03/1948 07/08/1949 13/08/1949 02/12/1962 10/12/1962 |
10/12/1962 | |
A2 | 60532 | 25/03/1948 | YK 64B HAY 61B 61B 62B 61B W |
York (North) Haymarket Haymarket Aberdeen Ferryhill Aberdeen Ferryhill Dundee Tay Bridge Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
25/03/1948 27/11/1949 03/12/1949 07/01/1951 31/01/1951 19/06/1961 04/12/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | ||
A2 | 60533 | 09/04/1948 | NWE COP NWE NWE 37B 37B 35A 38B 35A 35B 35A 35B 34A 34F 34E 36A 34E W |
New England Copley Hill (Leeds) New England New England Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) New England Annesley New England Grantham New England Grantham Kings Cross Grantham New England Doncaster New England Withdrawn |
09/04/1948 29/05/1948 19/12/1948 25/12/1948 12/03/1950 18/03/1950 30/04/1950 02/07/1950 09/07/1950 20/06/1954 16/09/1956 15/09/1957 08/06/1958 14/12/1958 14/06/1959 10/01/1960 23/09/1962 15/06/1963 |
15/06/1963 | ||
A2 | 60534 | 23/04/1948 | YK 64B HAY 64A W |
York (North) Haymarket Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
23/04/1948 27/11/1949 03/12/1949 13/11/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||
A2 | 60535 | 05/05/1948 | YK 64B HAY 64A 66A W |
York (North) Haymarket Haymarket St Margarets Polmadie Withdrawn |
05/05/1948 27/11/1949 03/12/1949 16/10/1961 15/09/1963 19/06/1965 |
19/06/1965 | ||
A2 | 60536 | 14/05/1948 | COP NWE NWE 64B HAY 64A 64B 64A 50A W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) New England New England Haymarket Haymarket St Margarets Haymarket St Margarets York (North) Withdrawn |
14/05/1948 26/12/1948 01/01/1949 20/11/1949 26/11/1949 13/11/1961 14/05/1962 08/10/1962 02/12/1962 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | ||
A2 | 60537 | 11/06/1948 | COP NWE NWE 61B ABD 64B 64B 64A W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) New England New England Aberdeen Ferryhill Aberdeen Ferryhill Haymarket Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
11/06/1948 02/01/1949 08/01/1949 01/07/1949 02/07/1949 07/01/1951 31/01/1951 13/11/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||
A2 | 60538 | 18/06/1948 | GHD 52B 52D W |
Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
18/06/1948 22/05/1960 01/10/1961 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||
A2 | 60539 | 27/08/1948 | HTN 52D W |
Heaton Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
27/08/1948 01/10/1961 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 |