LNER Peppercorn "A2" Class 4-6-2
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
A2 | 525 | 24/12/1947 | A.H. PEPPERCORN | 24/12/1947 | 27/03/1963 | ||
A2 | 526 | 09/01/1948 | SUGAR PALM | 09/01/1948 | 12/11/1962 | ||
A2 | 527 | 30/01/1948 | SUN CHARIOT | 30/01/1948 | 24/04/1965 | ||
A2 | 528 | 21/02/1948 | TUDOR MINSTREL | 21/02/1948 | 02/06/1966 | ||
A2 | 529 | 21/02/1948 | PEARL DIVER | 21/02/1948 | 29/12/1962 | ||
A2 | 530 | 04/03/1948 | SAYAJIRAO | 04/03/1948 | 19/11/1966 | ||
A2 | 531 | 12/03/1948 | BAHRAM | 12/03/1948 | 10/12/1962 | ||
A2 | 60532 | 25/03/1948 | BLUE PETER | 25/03/1948 | 31/12/1966 | ||
A2 | 60533 | 09/04/1948 | HAPPY KNIGHT | 09/04/1948 | 15/06/1963 | ||
A2 | 60534 | 23/04/1948 | IRISH ELEGANCE | 23/04/1948 | 29/12/1962 | ||
A2 | 60535 | 05/05/1948 | HORNET'S BEAUTY | 05/05/1948 | 19/06/1965 | ||
A2 | 60536 | 14/05/1948 | TRIMBUSH | 14/05/1948 | 17/12/1962 | ||
A2 | 60537 | 11/06/1948 | BACHELOR'S BUTTON | 11/06/1948 | 29/12/1962 | ||
A2 | 60538 | 18/06/1948 | VELOCITY | 18/06/1948 | 12/11/1962 | ||
A2 | 60539 | 27/08/1948 | BRONZINO | 27/08/1948 | 12/11/1962 |