CR/LMS McIntosh "652" Class 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/1936 | Reallocation | 17632 | 27J | Corkerhill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57629 | 32A | Inverness | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57630 | 27C | Hamilton (West) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57631 | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57633 | 30D | Ayr | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57634 | 32B | Aviemore | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57640 | 30D | Ayr | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57635 | 28C | Carstairs | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57636 | 12G | Dumfries | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57637 | 30B | Hurlford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57638 | 28A | Motherwell | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57639 | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57641 | 27A | Polmadie | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57642 | 29D | Forfar | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57643 | 30B | Hurlford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57644 | 30D | Ayr | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57632 | 27J | Corkerhill | 27A | Polmadie | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 57645 | 28B | Dalry Road | |||
03/04/1948 | Condemned | 57641 | 27A | Polmadie | COND | ||
04/09/1948 | Condemned | 57639 | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | COND | ||
18/09/1948 | Condemned | 57629 | 32A | Inverness | COND | ||
04/12/1948 | Condemned | 57636 | 12G | Dumfries | COND | ||
24/09/1950 | Reallocation | 57630 | 27C | Hamilton (West) | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 57630 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
04/02/1951 | Reallocation | 57634 | 32B | Aviemore | 60A | Inverness | |
17/02/1951 | Reallocation | 57634 | 60A | Inverness | 60A | Inverness | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 57632 | 27A | Polmadie | 60A | Inverness | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 57632 | 60A | Inverness | 66A | Polmadie | |
20/02/1954 | Reallocation | 57632 | 66A | Polmadie | 60B | Aviemore | |
07/08/1954 | Reallocation | 57634 | 60A | Inverness | 61C | Keith | |
14/03/1959 | Reallocation | 57642 | 29D | Forfar | 63B | Stirling | |
10/1959 | Condemned | 57638 | 28A | Motherwell | COND | ||
02/07/1960 | Reallocation | 57635 | 28C | Carstairs | 63C | Oban | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 57634 | 61C | Keith | 64C | Dalry Road | |
20/11/1961 | Condemned | 57640 | 30D | Ayr | COND | ||
20/11/1961 | Condemned | 57632 | 60B | Aviemore | COND | ||
07/12/1961 | Condemned | 57637 | 30B | Hurlford | COND | ||
11/12/1961 | Condemned | 57633 | 30D | Ayr | COND | ||
26/03/1962 | Condemned | 57635 | 63C | Oban | COND | ||
16/07/1962 | Condemned | 57642 | 63B | Stirling | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 57631 | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 57643 | 30B | Hurlford | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 57644 | 30D | Ayr | COND | ||
19/11/1962 | Condemned | 57645 | 28B | Dalry Road | COND | ||
22/12/1962 | Reallocation | 57630 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 66A | Polmadie | |
16/03/1963 | Reallocation | 57630 | 66A | Polmadie | 66E | Carstairs | |
16/03/1963 | Reallocation | 57634 | 64C | Dalry Road | 64F | Bathgate | |
11/05/1963 | Reallocation | 57634 | 64F | Bathgate | 64C | Dalry Road | |
23/08/1963 | Condemned | 57634 | 64C | Dalry Road | COND | ||
07/09/1963 | Reallocation | 57630 | 66E | Carstairs | 67D | Ardrossan | |
14/11/1963 | Condemned | 57630 | 67D | Ardrossan | COND |