Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2042 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19845 Week
» 72861 Month
» 192388 Year
» 3219241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: St Rollox (Balornock)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 29G | 1916 | 31/12/1939 | 31A | 01/01/1940 | 31/01/1950 | 65B | 01/02/1950 | 31/10/1966 |
|
Date Opened |
1916 |
Date Closed |
07/11/1966 |
Pre Grouping Company |
CR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
SCR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line about a mile east of St. Rollox Station. The yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn left outside St. Rollox Station into Castle Street, and left again
into Royston Road. Continue for about a mile and turn left into
Broomfield Road. The shed entrance is on the right, just past the
railway underbridge. Walking time 20 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 31A | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 65B | 07/11/1966 | Depot closed |
|
|
|