English Electric / RSH Ltd 40 1Co-Co1
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | BR (Dept) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D212 | 40012 | 97407 | 25/05/1959 | EE | Willesden | 04/04/1986 | 26.92 | Prs | Preserved | 64.97 | AUREOL | ||
D260 | 40060 | 97405 | 19/02/1960 | EE | Haymarket | 09/03/1987 | 27.08 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 03/1988 | 28.09 | ||
D318 | 40118 | 97408 | 20/02/1961 | RS | Crewe North | 26/02/1986 | 25 | Prs | Preserved | 63.22 | |||
D335 | 40135 | 97406 | 10/03/1961 | EE | Crewe North | 16/12/1986 | 25.75 | Prs | Preserved | 63.18 |