English Electric / RSH Ltd 40 1Co-Co1
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 212 | 25/05/1959 | AUREOL | 20/09/1960 | 04/04/1986 | ||
40 | 212 | 25/05/1959 | AUREOL | 20/09/1960 | 04/04/1986 | ||
40 | 213 | 01/06/1959 | ANDANIA | 16/06/1962 | 18/10/1984 | ||
40 | 214 | 08/06/1959 | ANTONIA | 20/05/1961 | 08/11/1981 | ||
40 | 215 | 15/06/1959 | AQUITANIA | 16/06/1962 | 13/11/1984 | ||
40 | 216 | 22/06/1959 | CAMPANIA | 16/06/1962 | 31/05/1981 | ||
40 | 217 | 09/06/1959 | CARINTHIA | 16/06/1962 | 01/02/1981 | ||
40 | 218 | 07/07/1959 | CARMANIA | 15/07/1961 | 14/09/1981 | ||
40 | 219 | 10/07/1959 | CARONIA | 16/06/1962 | 20/12/1981 | ||
40 | 220 | 13/07/1959 | FRANCONIA | 02/1963 | 29/08/1982 | ||
40 | 221 | 20/07/1959 | IVERNIA | 22/04/1961 | 17/07/1976 | ||
40 | 222 | 27/07/1959 | LACONIA | 11/1962 | 09/03/1984 | ||
40 | 223 | 05/08/1959 | LANCASTRIA | 22/04/1961 | 31/05/1981 | ||
40 | 224 | 10/08/1959 | LUCANIA | 08/09/1962 | 13/06/1984 | ||
40 | 225 | 17/08/1959 | LUSITANIA | 21/04/1962 | 17/10/1982 | ||
40 | 227 | 24/08/1959 | PARTHIA | 14/07/1962 | 24/04/1983 | ||
40 | 228 | 28/08/1959 | SAMARIA | 06/10/1962 | 18/10/1984 | ||
40 | 229 | 31/08/1959 | SAXONIA | 05/03/1963 | 25/04/1984 | ||
40 | 230 | 07/09/1959 | SCYTHIA | 22/04/1961 | 29/04/1983 | ||
40 | 231 | 11/09/1959 | SYLVANIA | 16/06/1962 | 31/05/1981 | ||
40 | 232 | 14/09/1959 | EMPRESS OF CANADA | 22/04/1961 | 01/02/1981 | ||
40 | 233 | 21/09/1959 | EMPRESS OF ENGLAND | 09/09/1961 | 03/09/1984 | ||
40 | 234 | 25/09/1959 | ACCRA | 16/06/1962 | 06/01/1984 | ||
40 | 235 | 28/09/1959 | APAPA | 16/06/1962 | 13/08/1984 |