40 |
D200
|
40122
|
|
14/03/1958 |
23/08/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D201
|
40001
|
|
03/04/1958 |
23/07/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D202
|
40002
|
|
30/04/1958 |
24/05/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D203
|
40003
|
|
16/05/1958 |
12/09/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D204
|
40004
|
|
30/05/1958 |
02/09/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D205
|
40005
|
|
25/06/1958 |
24/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D206
|
40006
|
|
09/07/1958 |
13/03/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
13/12/1975 |
40 |
D207
|
40007
|
|
23/07/1958 |
27/02/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
31/01/1975 |
40 |
D209
|
40009
|
|
15/09/1958 |
07/11/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
11/1976 |
40 |
D211
|
40011
|
|
20/05/1959 |
05/10/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
11/1976 |
97/4 |
D212
|
40012
|
97407
|
25/05/1959 |
04/04/1986 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
10/09/1960 |
40 |
D213
|
40013
|
|
01/06/1959 |
18/10/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
22/07/1971 |
40 |
D214
|
40014
|
|
08/06/1959 |
08/11/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/04/1972 |
40 |
D215
|
40015
|
|
15/06/1959 |
13/11/1984 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
12/1973 |
40 |
D221
|
40021
|
|
20/07/1959 |
17/07/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
40 |
D222
|
40022
|
|
27/07/1959 |
09/03/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D224
|
40024
|
|
10/08/1959 |
13/06/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D227
|
40027
|
|
24/08/1959 |
24/04/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D228
|
40028
|
|
28/08/1959 |
18/10/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D229
|
40029
|
|
31/08/1959 |
25/04/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
04/05/1973 |
40 |
D230
|
40030
|
|
07/09/1959 |
29/04/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/03/1971 |
40 |
D231
|
40031
|
|
11/09/1959 |
31/05/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/1970 |
40 |
D233
|
40033
|
|
21/09/1959 |
03/09/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
02/09/1971 |
40 |
D234
|
40034
|
|
25/09/1959 |
06/01/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D235
|
40035
|
|
28/09/1959 |
13/08/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/1974 |
40 |
D236
|
40036
|
|
05/10/1959 |
31/01/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D237
|
40037
|
|
09/10/1959 |
16/08/1981 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
40 |
D238
|
40038
|
|
12/10/1959 |
28/12/1980 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
40 |
D239
|
40039
|
|
19/10/1959 |
24/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
40 |
D240
|
40040
|
|
23/10/1959 |
27/07/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
40 |
D244
|
40044
|
|
09/11/1959 |
22/01/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
28/11/1972 |
40 |
D245
|
40045
|
|
16/11/1959 |
01/08/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
03/1970 |
40 |
D246
|
40046
|
|
20/11/1959 |
20/02/1983 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D247
|
40047
|
|
23/11/1959 |
13/11/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
01/04/1972 |
40 |
D250
|
40050
|
|
07/12/1959 |
08/08/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
20/03/1974 |
40 |
D251
|
40051
|
|
30/12/1959 |
29/01/1978 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
40 |
D252
|
40052
|
|
21/12/1959 |
17/06/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
22/03/1969 |
40 |
D253
|
40053
|
|
08/01/1960 |
18/06/1976 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/06/1971 |
40 |
D254
|
40054
|
|
31/12/1959 |
31/12/1977 |
Air Brakes fitted |
16/10/1971 |
40 |
D255
|
40055
|
|
11/01/1960 |
14/11/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
03/1973 |
40 |
D256
|
40056
|
|
29/01/1960 |
06/09/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
14/06/1969 |
40 |
D257
|
40057
|
|
01/02/1960 |
23/07/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
21/06/1969 |
40 |
D258
|
40058
|
|
03/02/1960 |
02/09/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
01/1970 |
97/4 |
D260
|
40060
|
97405
|
19/02/1960 |
09/03/1987 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
25/07/1981 |
40 |
D261
|
40061
|
|
26/02/1960 |
12/06/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/1971 |
40 |
D262
|
40062
|
|
04/03/1960 |
21/11/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
07/1981 |
40 |
D263
|
40063
|
|
07/03/1960 |
16/04/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/1971 |
40 |
D264
|
40064
|
|
11/03/1960 |
11/04/1982 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/1970 |
40 |
D266
|
40066
|
|
21/03/1960 |
05/04/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/1970 |
40 |
D267
|
40067
|
|
25/03/1960 |
12/07/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D268
|
40068
|
|
28/03/1960 |
24/07/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/12/1971 |
40 |
D269
|
40069
|
|
04/04/1960 |
18/09/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D271
|
40071
|
|
20/04/1960 |
07/09/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/04/1973 |
40 |
D273
|
40073
|
|
02/05/1960 |
10/06/1983 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
40 |
D274
|
40074
|
|
09/05/1960 |
09/03/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
19/04/1969 |
40 |
D276
|
40076
|
|
23/05/1960 |
18/04/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
03/1973 |
40 |
D277
|
40077
|
|
30/05/1960 |
17/06/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
30/05/1969 |
40 |
D278
|
40078
|
|
08/06/1960 |
23/08/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
20/03/1971 |
40 |
D279
|
40079
|
|
13/06/1960 |
21/01/1985 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
03/1973 |
40 |
D280
|
40080
|
|
17/06/1960 |
12/09/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
03/1982 |
40 |
D281
|
40081
|
|
20/06/1960 |
13/02/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
23/08/1969 |
40 |
D282
|
40082
|
|
27/06/1960 |
08/11/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
03/1973 |
40 |
D283
|
40083
|
|
04/07/1960 |
05/11/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
18/02/1971 |
40 |
D284
|
40084
|
|
11/07/1960 |
30/05/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
20/07/1970 |
40 |
D285
|
40085
|
|
18/07/1960 |
30/03/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
23/05/1970 |
40 |
D286
|
40086
|
|
25/07/1960 |
23/01/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
18/07/1969 |
40 |
D287
|
40087
|
|
03/08/1960 |
16/08/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D288
|
40088
|
|
08/08/1960 |
14/02/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D289
|
40089
|
|
15/08/1960 |
18/07/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D290
|
40090
|
|
22/08/1960 |
08/11/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D291
|
40091
|
|
29/08/1960 |
02/09/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D292
|
40092
|
|
05/09/1960 |
05/12/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D293
|
40093
|
|
12/09/1960 |
02/12/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D294
|
40094
|
|
23/09/1960 |
03/10/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D295
|
40095
|
|
26/09/1960 |
14/09/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D296
|
40096
|
|
03/10/1960 |
19/12/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D297
|
40097
|
|
10/10/1960 |
24/06/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D298
|
40098
|
|
17/10/1960 |
12/04/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D299
|
40099
|
|
24/10/1960 |
22/10/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D300
|
40100
|
|
31/10/1960 |
05/10/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D301
|
40101
|
|
04/11/1960 |
09/08/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D302
|
40102
|
|
07/11/1960 |
24/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D303
|
40103
|
|
18/11/1960 |
07/02/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D304
|
40104
|
|
28/11/1960 |
22/01/1985 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D305
|
40105
|
|
06/10/1960 |
01/12/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
11/1979 |
40 |
D307
|
40107
|
|
27/10/1960 |
20/12/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
03/1970 |
40 |
D310
|
40110
|
|
29/11/1960 |
28/12/1980 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
02/1973 |
40 |
D311
|
40111
|
|
06/12/1960 |
03/05/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/03/1973 |
40 |
D313
|
40113
|
|
20/12/1960 |
18/10/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
04/1977 |
40 |
D314
|
40114
|
|
29/12/1960 |
05/10/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
03/1977 |
40 |
D315
|
40115
|
|
13/01/1961 |
14/03/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
04/1970 |
40 |
D316
|
40116
|
|
20/01/1961 |
01/02/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D317
|
40117
|
|
06/02/1961 |
07/09/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
97/4 |
D318
|
40118
|
97408
|
20/02/1961 |
26/02/1986 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
12/1973 |
40 |
D321
|
40121
|
|
10/04/1961 |
13/03/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
10/1976 |
40 |
D324
|
40124
|
|
23/06/1961 |
06/01/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D325
|
40125
|
|
09/12/1960 |
31/05/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D326
|
40126
|
|
21/12/1960 |
15/02/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D327
|
40127
|
|
29/12/1960 |
14/02/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D328
|
40128
|
|
11/01/1961 |
20/09/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D329
|
40129
|
|
18/01/1961 |
24/05/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D330
|
40130
|
|
30/01/1961 |
14/03/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D331
|
40131
|
|
06/02/1961 |
03/10/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D332
|
40132
|
|
16/02/1961 |
07/03/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D333
|
40133
|
|
22/02/1961 |
23/01/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D334
|
40134
|
|
08/03/1961 |
31/05/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
97/4 |
D335
|
40135
|
97406
|
10/03/1961 |
16/12/1986 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
12/1975 |
40 |
D336
|
40136
|
|
21/03/1961 |
09/05/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D337
|
40137
|
|
24/03/1961 |
04/01/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D338
|
40138
|
|
29/03/1961 |
03/09/1982 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
01/1979 |
40 |
D339
|
40139
|
|
11/04/1961 |
14/02/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D340
|
40140
|
|
19/04/1961 |
07/03/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D341
|
40141
|
|
26/04/1961 |
09/10/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D342
|
40142
|
|
05/05/1961 |
21/04/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D343
|
40143
|
|
10/05/1961 |
22/01/1985 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D344
|
40144
|
|
18/05/1961 |
31/05/1981 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
40 |
D345
|
40145
|
|
17/05/1961 |
10/06/1983 |
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
12/10/1976 |
40 |
D346
|
40146
|
|
24/05/1961 |
05/10/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
06/1974 |
40 |
D347
|
40147
|
|
31/05/1961 |
07/09/1980 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
12/10/1976 |
40 |
D348
|
40148
|
|
07/06/1961 |
04/08/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
40 |
D349
|
40149
|
|
14/06/1961 |
23/08/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
12/10/1976 |
40 |
D350
|
40150
|
|
21/06/1961 |
22/01/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
21/03/1970 |
40 |
D351
|
40151
|
|
28/06/1961 |
01/02/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
15/02/1969 |
40 |
D352
|
40152
|
|
05/07/1961 |
21/01/1985 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
15/02/1969 |
40 |
D353
|
40153
|
|
12/07/1961 |
12/09/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
22/07/1977 |
40 |
D354
|
40154
|
|
19/07/1961 |
10/01/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
15/02/1969 |
40 |
D355
|
40155
|
|
16/08/1961 |
22/01/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
40 |
D356
|
40156
|
|
23/08/1961 |
27/07/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
40 |
D357
|
40157
|
|
30/08/1961 |
26/07/1983 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
40 |
D358
|
40158
|
|
06/09/1961 |
19/12/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
07/1981 |
40 |
D359
|
40159
|
|
13/09/1961 |
21/03/1983 |
Multiple Working Removed |
09/1981 |
40 |
D362
|
40162
|
|
11/10/1961 |
14/12/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
07/1981 |
40 |
D363
|
40163
|
|
18/10/1961 |
06/06/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
09/1978 |
40 |
D364
|
40164
|
|
25/10/1961 |
04/07/1983 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
40 |
D365
|
40165
|
|
01/11/1961 |
06/07/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
07/1973 |
40 |
D366
|
40166
|
|
18/11/1961 |
14/02/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
09/1978 |
40 |
D367
|
40167
|
|
22/11/1961 |
09/02/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/1972 |
40 |
D368
|
40168
|
|
01/12/1961 |
29/11/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/1970 |
40 |
D369
|
40169
|
|
07/12/1961 |
02/12/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D370
|
40170
|
|
13/12/1961 |
02/12/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D371
|
40171
|
|
20/12/1961 |
13/12/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D372
|
40172
|
|
03/01/1962 |
12/09/1983 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1978 |
40 |
D373
|
40173
|
|
05/01/1962 |
24/08/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D374
|
40174
|
|
17/01/1962 |
24/05/1984 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1978 |
40 |
D375
|
40175
|
|
31/01/1962 |
31/05/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D376
|
40176
|
|
05/02/1962 |
23/08/1981 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1978 |
40 |
D377
|
40177
|
|
09/02/1962 |
09/07/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D378
|
40178
|
|
16/02/1962 |
21/06/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D379
|
40179
|
|
21/02/1962 |
01/02/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D380
|
40180
|
|
05/03/1962 |
01/06/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D381
|
40181
|
|
12/03/1962 |
21/01/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
03/1979 |
40 |
D382
|
40182
|
|
14/03/1962 |
23/06/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D383
|
40183
|
|
21/03/1962 |
01/06/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D384
|
40184
|
|
19/03/1962 |
21/12/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D385
|
40185
|
|
28/03/1962 |
08/08/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D386
|
40186
|
|
04/04/1962 |
21/12/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D387
|
40187
|
|
11/04/1962 |
15/08/1982 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D388
|
40188
|
|
18/04/1962 |
31/08/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D389
|
40189
|
|
02/05/1962 |
04/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D390
|
40190
|
|
09/05/1962 |
31/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D391
|
40191
|
|
16/05/1962 |
16/09/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D392
|
40192
|
|
30/05/1962 |
21/01/1985 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
15/02/1969 |
40 |
D393
|
40193
|
|
07/06/1962 |
24/10/1981 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
15/02/1969 |
40 |
D394
|
40194
|
|
13/06/1962 |
23/01/1985 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
30/08/1970 |
40 |
D395
|
40195
|
|
27/06/1962 |
22/06/1984 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
15/02/1969 |
40 |
D396
|
40196
|
|
04/07/1962 |
17/05/1984 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
40 |
D397
|
40197
|
|
18/07/1962 |
18/09/1983 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |
40 |
D398
|
40198
|
|
15/08/1962 |
11/01/1983 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1979 |
40 |
D399
|
40199
|
|
05/09/1962 |
13/06/1982 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
30/08/1970 |