SR Stroudley "E1" Class 0-6-0T
Class | SR (1931) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Black Tanks | 2097 | 32097 | 12/1883 | BA 9E W |
Bricklayers Arms Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 12/1949 |
12/1949 |
Black Tanks | 2112 | 32112 | 04/1877 | SOT BM BAS W |
Southampton Docks Bournemouth Basingstoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 12/12/1949 17/12/1949 |
17/12/1949 |
Black Tanks | 2113 | 32113 | 05/1877 | TON BA 71A 71I W |
Tonbridge Bricklayers Arms Eastleigh Southampton Docks Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 14/02/1953 10/10/1955 09/1958 |
09/1958 |
Black Tanks | 2122 | 32122 | 08/1878 | BTN W |
Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1948 |
05/1948 |
Black Tanks | 2127 | 32127 | 10/1878 | BTN W |
Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 |
Black Tanks | 2128 | 32128 | 10/1878 | BA BAT 71I 71I 73B 73B W |
Bricklayers Arms Stewarts Lane Southampton Docks Southampton Docks Bricklayers Arms Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1949 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 11/04/1951 13/04/1951 03/1952 |
03/1952 |
Black Tanks | 2129 | 32129 | 10/1878 | TON 9E FRA W |
Tonbridge Nine Elms Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 31/07/1949 09/06/1951 |
09/06/1951 |
Black Tanks | 2133 | 32133 | 12/1878 | ELH 71I 71I 71I 71I W |
Eastleigh Southampton Docks Southampton Docks Southampton Docks Southampton Docks Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 19/03/1952 12/1952 |
12/1952 |
Black Tanks | 2138 | 32138 | 01/1879 | TON 9E 71I 71I 71D W |
Tonbridge Nine Elms Southampton Docks Southampton Docks Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 12/05/1951 19/03/1952 07/10/1952 03/11/1956 |
03/11/1956 |
Black Tanks | 2139 | 32139 | 03/1879 | BTN 71D 71D W |
Brighton Fratton Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 10/01/1959 |
10/01/1959 |
Black Tanks | 2141 | 32141 | 03/1879 | BA W |
Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 |
Black Tanks | 2142 | 32142 | 03/1879 | BA 75A 75A W |
Bricklayers Arms Brighton Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 09/10/1950 11/1950 |
11/1950 |
Black Tanks | 2145 | 32145 | 10/1879 | TON 75A 75A 75A W |
Tonbridge Brighton Brighton Brighton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 08/12/1950 05/02/1951 02/06/1951 |
02/06/1951 |
Black Tanks | 2147 | 32147 | 10/1879 | ELH 75A 73B W |
Eastleigh Brighton Bricklayers Arms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/02/1951 27/06/1951 12/1951 |
12/1951 |
Black Tanks | 2151 | 32151 | 12/1880 | BA 71A 71I W |
Bricklayers Arms Eastleigh Southampton Docks Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/02/1951 17/11/1956 30/01/1960 |
30/01/1960 |
Black Tanks | 2153 | 32153 | 03/1881 | FRA W |
Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
Black Tanks | 2156 | 32156 | 03/1881 | SOT W |
Southampton Docks Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1951 |
05/1951 |
Black Tanks | 2606 | 32606 | 10/1876 | BTN 71I W |
Brighton Southampton Docks Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 08/1956 |
08/1956 |
Black Tanks | 2609 | 32609 | 03/1877 | ELH W |
Eastleigh Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1948 |
06/1948 |
Black Tanks | 2689 | 32689 | 05/1883 | SOT 75A 71I 71I 71I W |
Southampton Docks Brighton Southampton Docks Southampton Docks Southampton Docks Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 14/03/1951 20/03/1951 12/05/1951 27/02/1960 |
27/02/1960 |
Black Tanks | 2690 | 32690 | 05/1883 | FRA W |
Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1950 |
01/1950 |
Black Tanks | 2691 | 32691 | 10/1883 | FRA W |
Fratton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1951 |
12/1951 |
Black Tanks | 2694 | 32694 | 03/1875 | FRA 71I 70F 71I 70F 71I 71I W |
Fratton Southampton Docks Fratton Southampton Docks Fratton Southampton Docks Southampton Docks Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/06/1956 11/07/1956 27/08/1956 17/11/1956 26/11/1959 31/12/1959 29/07/1961 |
29/07/1961 |
Black Tanks | 1 | 01/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1957 | 03/1957 | |
Black Tanks | 2 | 14/09/1865 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1956 | 09/1956 | |
Black Tanks | 3 | 03/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1959 | 06/1959 | |
Black Tanks | 4 | 11/1878 | 1A W |
Willesden Withdrawn |
07/02/1948 22/10/1960 |
22/10/1960 |